Yasser Abdel-Aziz v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Plaintiff: Yasser Abdel-Aziz
Defendant: Lee Francis Cisna, Alanna Y Ow, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 2:2019cv07737
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yasser Abdel-Aziz, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Gallinger, Todd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Beck counsel for Defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cisna, Kevin McAleenan, Alanna Y Ow, Christopher A. Wray. Adding Daniel A. Beck as counsel of record for KEVIN MCALEENAN, as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security; LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, as Director of USCIS; ALANNA Y. OW, as District Director of the San Diego District Office of USCIS; CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, as Director of FBI; William Barr, as Attorney General of DoJ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants KEVIN MCALEENAN,LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, ALANNA Y. OW, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY and William Barr. (Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Lee Francis Cisna(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Alanna Y Ow(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cisna, Kevin McAleenan, Alanna Y Ow, Christopher A. Wray. (esa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 * REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS * CIVIL COVER SHEET * FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 09/06/2019, receipt number 0973-24394799), filed by Plaintiff Yasser Abdel-Aziz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallinger, Todd) Modified on 9/6/2019 (esa). Modified on 9/6/2019 (esa).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Yasser Abdel-Aziz, (Gallinger, Todd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24394799 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Yasser Abdel-Aziz. (Attorney Todd Gallinger added to party Yasser Abdel-Aziz(pty:pla))(Gallinger, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yasser Abdel-Aziz v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cisna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alanna Y Ow
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasser Abdel-Aziz
Represented By: Todd Gallinger
Represented By: Aabru Madni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?