Sina Kianpour v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sina Kianpour
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company and Severson and Werson
Case Number: 2:2019cv07776
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Marquis Ian Wraight on behalf of Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company (Attorney Marquis Ian Wraight added to party Severson and Werson(pty:dft), Attorney Marquis Ian Wraight added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Marquis Ian Wraight added to party Wells Fargo and Company(pty:dft))(Wraight, Marquis)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order DISCHARGING OSC re: subject matter jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Sina Kianpour, re PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION #32 , Notice of Lodging #33 , PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #34 , served on 10/17/19. (bm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 34 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpourto re MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction #25 (bm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour (Attachments: #1 Exhibits On CD)(bm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 32 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO 1) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS ("MTD") THE COMPLAINT; 2) DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re: MOTION to Dismiss #28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint #29 filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (bm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #29 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Campbell, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 , MOTION to Strike Causes of Action #23 , Request for Judicial Notice #24 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other: The hearing date selected is closed for NEW motions. See Calendars>Motion Calendar. (bm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than October 21, 2019 why the Court should not dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond by this date will result in this case being dismissed. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL Executed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour, upon Defendant Severson and Werson served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Wells Fargo and Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/7/19. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #23 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Campbell, John) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bm).
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/7/19. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bm).
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/7/19. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bm).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motion to Dismiss #16 , Special Motion to Strike #17 , Request for Judicial Notice #18 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other: The hearing date selected is closed for NEW motions. See Calendars>Motion Calendar. (bm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss #16 , MOTION to Strike #17 , Request for Judicial Notice, #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Motions are noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION submitted by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour received on 9/16/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Summons on 9/13/19. If summons are missing pages, then they must be refiled at civil intake. (yl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/3/19. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #17 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Campbell, John) Modified on 10/3/2019 (bm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/3/19. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Causes of Action - Anti-Slapp - Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John) Modified on 10/3/2019 (bm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/3/19. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Campbell, John) Modified on 10/3/2019 (bm).
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, and certificate of interested parties executed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour, upon Defendant Severson and Werson served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Wells Fargo and Company served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by mail.Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company, (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Severson and Werson(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Wells Fargo and Company(pty:dft))(Campbell, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Severson and Werson, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05812-VAP-SA; 2:17-cv-01757-SJO-GJS (Campbell, John)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge S. James Otero, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-01757 SJO (GJSx) (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Wells Fargo and Company. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Severson and Werson. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07776 PSG(JCx). (rn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING of 1 Envelope by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sina Kianpour v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D Lonergan
Represented By: Marquis Ian Wraight
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Represented By: Mark D Lonergan
Represented By: Marquis Ian Wraight
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severson and Werson
Represented By: Mark D Lonergan
Represented By: Marquis Ian Wraight
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sina Kianpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?