Cynthia Garey et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Garey, Megan Mackelvie, Erin Kelley and Cynthia Garey
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., DOES 1 through 20, inclusive, M.D. Raymond Schaerf, Raymond Schaerf and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Abbott Sales, Marketing and Distribution Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07777
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation #28 to Reset Hearing on motion to Remand #23 and for Leave to Amend the Complaint #24 to 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Reset filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edelstein, Andrew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie. (Martin, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie. (Martin, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF LODGING filed for Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Martin, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Martin, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Chester Double counsel for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Robert Chester Double is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Double, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein counsel for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Adding Andrew Z. Edelstein as counsel of record for Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party Abbott Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft))(Edelstein, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Michael B Martin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie, designating David D Ernst as local counsel. (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24482236) filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Garey, Shannon Garey, Erin Kelley, Megan Mackelvie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ernst, David)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L Ring APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., designating Robert C Double III as local counsel. (jp)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E Tauber APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., designating Robert C Double III as local counsel. (jp)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation Extending Abbott's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint #11 . (jp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Tauber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24443122) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24444669) filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Double, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Tauber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24443122) #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Double, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Tauber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24443122) filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Double, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 days after the final resolution of Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Double, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #9 served on 09/11/2019. (Double, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L Ring. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E Tauber. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
September 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Does, Raymond Schaerf, M.D., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Megan Mackelvie, Cynthia Garey, Erin Kelley, Shannon Garey.(filed in state court 8/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 09/09/2019. (Double, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., (Double, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Double, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27376 Receipt No: 0973-24403716 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit 6 Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, #7 Exhibit 7 ADR Packet, #8 Exhibit 8 First Amended General Order, #9 Exhibit 9 Standing Order re Personal Injury Procedures, #10 Exhibit 10 Notice and Pro Hac Vice Application, #11 Exhibit 11 Los Angeles Superior Court Docket) (Attorney Robert Chester Double added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Chester Double added to party Abbott Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft))(Double, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Garey et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Edelstein
Represented By: Andrew E Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Edelstein
Represented By: Andrew E Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Raymond Schaerf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Schaerf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Abbott Sales, Marketing and Distribution Co.
Represented By: Robert Chester Double
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Edelstein
Represented By: Andrew E Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Garey
Represented By: Stephen L Backus
Represented By: Michael B Martin
Represented By: David D Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Mackelvie
Represented By: Stephen L Backus
Represented By: Michael B Martin
Represented By: David D Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kelley
Represented By: Stephen L Backus
Represented By: Michael B Martin
Represented By: David D Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Garey
Represented By: Stephen L Backus
Represented By: Michael B Martin
Represented By: David D Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?