Annabelle Dominguez et al v. 24-7 Safety et al
Plaintiff: Asucena Cruz, Elizabeth Icedo, Vanessa Pedraza, Annabelle Dominguez and Linzie Fernandez
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Torrance Refining Company LLC, 24-7 Safety and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv07792
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19STCP03215. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) Modified on 9/13/2019 (mrgo).
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Laurelyn Bergfeld re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #4 filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Rollins, Melanie)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07792 PA(JCx). (rn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP on 9/6/2019, attached as Exhibit L. (jtil) Modified on 9/10/2019 (jtil).
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Icedo, Asucena Cruz, Annabelle Dominguez, Linzie Fernandez and Vanessa Pedraza in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/30/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on 9-10-2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCP03215 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/09/2019, receipt number 0973-24406400), filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Darrow Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Darrow Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Darrow Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Darrow Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Darrow Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Darrow Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Darrow Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Darrow Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Darrow Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J to Darrow Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K to Darrow Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L to Darrow Declaration, #14 Declaration Declaration of Michael Madden in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M to Madden Declaration, #16 Declaration Declaration of Ronnie Cowart in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #17 Exhibit Exhibit N to Cowart Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit O to Cowart Declaration)(Darrow, Tanja)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Darrow, Tanja)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, identifying Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Marathon Petroleum Company, LP(pty:dft))(Darrow, Tanja)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP identifying Marathon Petroleum Company LP as Corporate Parent. (Darrow, Tanja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annabelle Dominguez et al v. 24-7 Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company, LP
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrance Refining Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24-7 Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asucena Cruz
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Icedo
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Pedraza
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annabelle Dominguez
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linzie Fernandez
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?