Lamel Wilson v. Warden
Petitioner: Lamel Wilson
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 2:2019cv07866
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pursuant to the Order Dismissing Petition and Denying Certificate of Appealability, IT IS ADJUDGED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus and this action are dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (clee)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge R. Gary Klausner. THEREFORE, the Petition is ordered DISMISSED for being unexhausted and untimely. Judgment dismissing this habeas action with prejudice will be entered accordingly. FURTHERMORE, a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED because Petitioner has not shown both that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the Petition states a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right and that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the Court is correct in its procedural rulings. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); Fed. R. App. P. 22(b); Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Presented By Order issued by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 forwarded to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for review.(clee)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #3 , filed by Petitioner Lamel Wilson (hr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: EXHAUSTION AND TIMELINESS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim.THEREFORE, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before October 17, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of exhaustion and untimeliness. If Petitioner no longer wishes to pursue this action, he may voluntarily dismiss the action using the attached Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Form CV-09. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). But if Petitioner files no notice of voluntary dismissal or timely response to this order explaining how his claims are exhausted and timely, the Court may also recommend involuntary dismissal of the petition for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) L.R. 41-1. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal Form) (clee)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition) (car)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Lamel Wilson. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamel Wilson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamel Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?