Brian Whitaker v. JAW et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Slab BBQ, LLC, Does 1-10 and JAW
Case Number: 2:2019cv07887
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Slab BBQ, LLC, identifying Markhor Holdings LLC, Hakkasan Holdings LLC, Donald Park, John Terzian, Brian Toll, Born and Raised Hospitality LLC, Burt Bakman, Tonlap, LLC. (Sanders, Rachel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Slab BBQ, LLC.(Sanders, Rachel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant JAW served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Julian Ohayon in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Slab BBQ, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T Corporation System - Gabriella Sanchez (intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Slab BBQ, LLC answer now due 11/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Slab BBQ, LLC.(Attorney Rachel M Sanders added to party Slab BBQ, LLC(pty:dft))(Sanders, Rachel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants JAW, Slab BBQ, LLC. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24423225 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. JAW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slab BBQ, LLC
Represented By: Rachel M Sanders
Represented By: Charles D Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?