Brian Whitaker v. Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07888
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Seabock, Amanda)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #16 served on 10/14/2019. (Handy, Russell)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S UNRUH CLAIM by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. The Court therefore dismisses that claim without prejudice. See 28 USC Sub-section 1367(c)(2) and (c)(4). (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07888 RGK(FFMx). (rn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hugo (Doe), person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07888 CBM (FFMx). (esa)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07888 CAS (FFMx). (esa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER(In Chambers): by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than September 30, 2019. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lom)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24423232 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplethings Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?