Brian Whitaker v. Fred Kessler et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Hummus Republic 3rd LLC, Fred Kessler and Helen Kessler
Case Number: 2:2019cv07889
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ake)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Helen Kessler. (Seabock, Amanda)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hummus Republic 3rd LLC answer now due 10/22/2019; Helen Kessler answer now due 10/22/2019; Fred Kessler answer now due 10/22/2019, filed by Defendants Hummus Republic 3rd LLC; Helen Kessler; Fred Kessler.(Attorney Keith W Berglund added to party Hummus Republic 3rd LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Keith W Berglund added to party Fred Kessler(pty:dft), Attorney Keith W Berglund added to party Helen Kessler(pty:dft))(Berglund, Keith)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Fred Kessler served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert K- caregiver in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Hummus Republic 3rd LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JORDYN WEEKLY in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hummus Republic 3rd LLC, Fred Kessler, Helen Kessler. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,, (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24423256 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker,(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Fred Kessler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hummus Republic 3rd LLC
Represented By: Keith W Berglund
Represented By: Russell J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Kessler
Represented By: Keith W Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Kessler
Represented By: Keith W Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?