Unicolors, Inc. v. Boot Barn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, BOOT BARN, INC. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07894
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (gk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Jeong, Chan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Boot Barn, Inc. answer now due 11/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc..(Murray, Sean)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Richard Malmgren counsel for Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. Adding Eric R. Malmgren as counsel of record for Boot Barn, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. (Attorney Eric Richard Malmgren added to party Boot Barn, Inc.(pty:dft))(Malmgren, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Philip M Nelson counsel for Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. Adding Philip M. Nelson as counsel of record for Boot Barn, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. (Attorney Philip M Nelson added to party Boot Barn, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nelson, Philip)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc., identifying Boot Barn Holdings, Inc.. (Murray, Sean)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Boot Barn, Inc. answer now due 10/24/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc..(Murray, Sean)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean M Murray counsel for Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. Adding Sean M. Murray as counsel of record for Boot Barn, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boot Barn, Inc.. (Attorney Sean M Murray added to party Boot Barn, Inc.(pty:dft))(Murray, Sean)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., Becky Degeorge served on 9/19/19. (Jeong, Chan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Boot Barn, Inc. (ghap)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Jeong, Chan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24424568 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Boot Barn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Represented By: John Ryan Baldivia
Represented By: Scott Lee Satkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOOT BARN, INC.
Represented By: Eric Richard Malmgren
Represented By: Sean M Murray
Represented By: Philip M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?