Dean Drakis v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: DEAN DRAKIS
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv07939
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America ("Prudential"), Prudential Financial, Inc.. (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 11/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Nunneri, Tatiana)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dean Drakis, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro of CT Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (lh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff DEAN DRAKIS. (Bather, Phillip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DEAN DRAKIS, (Bather, Phillip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DEAN DRAKIS. (Bather, Phillip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24431075 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DEAN DRAKIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party DEAN DRAKIS(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean Drakis v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri
Represented By: Jason A James
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN DRAKIS
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?