Yesenia Richmond v. Reefer Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yesenia Richmond
Defendant: Reefer Systems, Inc. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv07940
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike (Doc. No. 9) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court therefore GRANTS IN PART Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike, with leave to amend. The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Discrimination in Violation of FEHA, Interference with Leave and Violations of California's Pregnancy Disability Leave Law and New Parent Leave Act, and Failure to Investigate and Prevent Discrimination in Violation of FEHA claims against Defendant ReefCo. The Court DENIES the Motion to Dismiss the Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy and Retaliation in Violation of FEHA claims against Defendant ReefCo, and DENIES the Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint no later than November 25, 2019. (bm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY Reply in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #9 filed by Defendant Reefer Systems, Inc.. (Drenan, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stacey R. Brown, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Brown, Stacey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Reefer Systems, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Matthew T. Drenan, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew T. Drenan, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew T. Drenan, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 1 to RJN, #7 Exhibit 2 to RJN, #8 Exhibit 3 to RJN, #9 Exhibit 4 to RJN, #10 Exhibit 5 to RJN, #11 Exhibit 6 to RJN, #12 Exhibit 7 to RJN, #13 Proposed Order) (Drenan, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by defendant Reefer Systems, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 09/13/2019. (Sorrentino, Paul)
September 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Reefer Systems, Inc. amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Richmond. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
September 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Richmond, upon Defendant. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2) (lh)
September 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Reefer Systems, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Richmond. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2 #1 ) (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reefer Systems, Inc. (Sorrentino, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Reefer Systems, Inc., (Sorrentino, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Reefer Systems, Inc.. (Sorrentino, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 19STCV26305 Receipt No: 0973-24431223 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Reefer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul F. Sorrentino, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Paul F. Sorrentino, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Paul F. Sorrentino, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Paul F. Sorrentino, #5 Declaration of William Willett) (Attorney Paul F Sorrentino added to party Reefer Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sorrentino, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesenia Richmond v. Reefer Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Richmond
Represented By: Sarah B Schlehr
Represented By: Stacey Rochelle Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reefer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paul F Sorrentino
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?