Four Jays Music Company v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Four Jays Music Company and Julia Riva
Defendant: Apple Inc, Cleopatra Records Inc, Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc and Google LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07952
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 30, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #20 filed by Defendants Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Steinthal, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ilissa Stacy Samplin counsel for Defendant Apple Inc. Adding Ilissa Samplin as counsel of record for Apple Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attorney Ilissa Stacy Samplin added to party Apple Inc(pty:dft))(Samplin, Ilissa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 30 APPLE INC.S FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL CIV. R. 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple Inc, (Edelman, Scott)
November 6, 2019 Filing 29 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott A Edelman on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Attorney Scott A Edelman added to party Apple Inc(pty:dft))(Edelman, Scott)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva, upon Defendant Apple Inc served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Giskan, Oren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. upon Google LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John Nadolenco. (Giskan, Oren)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. upon Cleopatra Records Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Peter Anderson. (Giskan, Oren)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #20 as to Defendant Apple Inc, Cleopatra Records Inc, Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. (iv)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-7952-CJC-MAA, but should read CV 19-7952-FMO-MAA. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 FILING OF AN ACTION REPORT of a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Giskan, Oren)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Oren Giskan Regarding Joinder of Multiple Copyright Claims filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Giskan, Oren)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #20 filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Giskan, Oren)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Apple Inc, Cleopatra Records Inc, Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc, Google LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composition Chart, #2 Exhibit Infringement Chart - Apple, #3 Infringement Chart - Google)(Attorney Oren S Giskan added to party Julia Riva(pty:pla))(Giskan, Oren)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Orchard Enterprises NY, INC answer now due 11/8/2019; The Orchard Enterprises Inc answer now due 11/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Orchard Enterprises NY, INC; The Orchard Enterprises Inc.(Steinthal, Kenneth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc, identifying The Orchard Enterprises, Inc.; The Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc.; Orchard Media, Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment; Sony Corporation; Mutual Insurance. (Steinthal, Kenneth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis counsel for Defendants Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. Adding Joseph N. Akrotirianakis as counsel of record for The Orchard Enterprises, Inc. and Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The Orchard Enterprises, Inc. and Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc.. (Attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis added to party Orchard Enterprises NY, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis added to party The Orchard Enterprises Inc(pty:dft))(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kenneth L Steinthal counsel for Defendants Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. Adding Kenneth L. Steinthal as counsel of record for The Orchard Enterprises, Inc. and Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Orchard Enterprises, Inc. and Orchard Enterprises, NY, Inc.. (Attorney Kenneth L Steinthal added to party Orchard Enterprises NY, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth L Steinthal added to party The Orchard Enterprises Inc(pty:dft))(Steinthal, Kenneth)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Four Jays Music Company, designating Allen Hyman as local counsel #12 . (iv)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-04073 JFW (RAOx) (esa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Four Jays Music Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24477813) filed by plaintiff Four Jays Music Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hyman, Allen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Apple Inc, Cleopatra Records Inc, Orchard Enterprises NY, INC, The Orchard Enterprises Inc. (iv)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Four Jays Music Company. correcting Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hyman, Allen)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07952 FMO (MAAx). (esa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #5 filed by plaintiff Four Jays Music Company. (Hyman, Allen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Oren S. Giskan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew F. Schwartz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Request was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events>Service Documents>Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints>Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The case initiating documents: Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Interested Parties and Report on Filing of Copyright Action were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24433192 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Four Jays Music Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document) (Attorney Allen Hyman added to party Four Jays Music Company(pty:pla))(Hyman, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Four Jays Music Company v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Represented By: Ilissa Stacy Samplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleopatra Records Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Enterprises NY, INC
Represented By: Kenneth L Steinthal
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orchard Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Kenneth L Steinthal
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Jays Music Company
Represented By: Allen Hyman
Represented By: Oren S Giskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Riva
Represented By: Oren S Giskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?