Kiana Horn v. Nuwave, LLC
Plaintiff: Kiana Horn
Defendant: Nuwave, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07955
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nuwave, LLC answer now due 11/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Nuwave, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas S. Lee in Support of Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3), #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3))(Attorney Patrick E Michela added to party Nuwave, LLC(pty:dft))(Michela, Patrick)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn, upon Defendant Nuwave, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yudeli Ochoa, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zavareei, Hassan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Nuwave, LLC. (mrgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Zavareei, Hassan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #19 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Zavareei, Hassan)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan M. Streisfeld APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kiana Horn, designating Daniel L. Warshaw as local counsel. (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kiana Horn, designating Daniel L. Warshaw as local counsel. (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Ostrow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kiana Horn, designating Daniel L. Warshaw as local counsel. (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kiana Horn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485343) filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kiana Horn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485259) filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kiana Horn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485032) filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel L Warshaw counsel for Plaintiff Kiana Horn. Adding Daniel L. Warshaw as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel L. Warshaw. (Attorney Daniel L Warshaw added to party Kiana Horn(pty:pla))(Warshaw, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07955 SVW (KSx). (esa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S Weiner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew W Lanahan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan M Streisfeld. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M Ostrow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn, identifying NuWave, LLC. (Zavareei, Hassan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Zavareei, Hassan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24433756 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kiana Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Hassan A Zavareei added to party Kiana Horn(pty:pla))(Zavareei, Hassan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiana Horn v. Nuwave, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiana Horn
Represented By: Hassan A Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuwave, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?