Darrell Dewey v. Andrew M. Saul
Petitioner: Darrell Dewey and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv08002
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey. (Shvarts, Michelle)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 10/2/2019, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Shvarts, Michelle)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (kh)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth GRANTING #8 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support. (kh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey. (Shvarts, Michelle)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiff's IFP Application #3 is denied with leave to amend. Plaintiff may pay the required filing fee or file an amended Application within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. (kh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey, (Shvarts, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Darrell Dewey. (Shvarts, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey. (Shvarts, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey. (Shvarts, Michelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Dewey. (Attorney Michelle J Shvarts added to party Darrell Dewey(pty:bkmov))(Shvarts, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrell Dewey v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Dewey
Represented By: Michelle J Shvarts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?