GemCap Lending I, LLC v. R. John Taylor
Plaintiff: GemCap Lending I, LLC
Defendant: R. John Taylor
Case Number: 2:2019cv08008
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/16/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant R. John Taylor, identifying GEMCAP LENDING, Plaintiff; R. John Taylor, Defendant; CropUSA Insurance Agency, Interested Parties; AIA Services Corporations, Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cogger, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against GemCap Lending I, LLC filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant R. John Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cogger, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT R. JOHN TAYLOR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #16 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant R. John shall have up to and including November 7, 2019 to respond to the Complaint. (mrgo)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause #15 , issued on 10/11/2019, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 11/7/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #16 PLAINTIFF GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R. JOHN TAYLOR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Lee, David)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant R. John Taylor #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: An Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Respond is pending. (mrgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant R. John Taylor filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David C. Lee in Support of Request to Enter Default) (Lee, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 11/7/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant R. John Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Cogger, #2 Declaration of R. John Taylor, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant R. John Taylor's Ex Parte Application to Extend Time, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney John P Cogger added to party R. John Taylor(pty:dft)) (Cogger, John)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2019.) (mrgo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC, upon Defendant R. John Taylor served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Lee, David)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge S. James Otero, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-05504 SJO (MANx) (esa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE CORRECTED L.R. 83-1.3.1 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Lee, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC'S L.R. 83-1.3.1 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant R. John Taylor. (lh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. Related Case(s): 13-CV-5504-SJO (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC, (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Lee, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24444665 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GemCap Lending I, LLC. (Attorney David Crockett Lee added to party GemCap Lending I, LLC(pty:pla))(Lee, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GemCap Lending I, LLC v. R. John Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. John Taylor
Represented By: John P Cogger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GemCap Lending I, LLC
Represented By: David Crockett Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?