Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Case Number: 2:2019cv08051
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case * Defendant Health Care Service Corporation DBA Blue Cross And Blue Shield Of Illinois Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint * filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Shlesinger, Amir)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation.(Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Barr Johansen added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Johansen, Sarah)
September 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/9/2019, attached as Exhibit 1.(jtil)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation, identifying Health Care Service Corporation; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. (Shlesinger, Amir)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Shlesinger, Amir)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00415 Receipt No: 0973-24454082 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Johansen, #2 Declaration of John Kosky, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Sarah Barr Johansen
Represented By: Michelle L Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Sarah Barr Johansen
Represented By: Michelle L Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?