Michael Dunn v. Montgomery
Petitioner: Michael Dunn
Respondent: Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2019cv08059
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
2 Judge: John E McDermott
3 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING filed NOTICE OF LODGING IN 28 U.S.C. 2254 CASE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #7 (Attachments: #1 CT_One Vol., #2 Docket for California COA Case No. B300289)(Kline, Jonathan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Respondent Montgomery. (Kline, Jonathan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Jonathan J. Kline on behalf of Respondent Montgomery. (Attorney Jonathan J Kline added to party Montgomery(pty:res))(Kline, Jonathan)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND INSTRUCTIONS GOVERNING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance, NOT LATER THAN 14 days from this date. Respondent shall file an Answer to the Petition or a Motion to Dismiss the Petition not later than 28 days after the filing date of this Order. Respondent may raise by a Motion to Dismiss or Answer any claim that Petitioner. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. [See Order for details.] (Attachments: #1 Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 CV11-B Consent form) (et)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08059 CJC (JEM). (mrgo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Michael Dunn. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Michael Dunn. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Dunn v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Montgomery
Represented By: Jonathan J Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?