BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC v. DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, Brigitte Daza and DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08085
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC, re Order,,,,,, Distribution of Funds,,,,,, Terminated Case,,,,, #16 served on 11/13/19. (Maguire, Daniel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISCHARGE FROM LIABILITY, AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS, DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS, AND DISMISSAL OF CASE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #14 , Plaintiff BRE Iconic having deposited with the Court the amount of $95,622.23 representing the amount in dispute in this interpleader action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff BRE Iconic is hereby and shall be discharged from any liability to Defendants to the full extent permitted by law with respect to Club Membership No. 14803 (the "Membership"). Plaintiff and Defendants represent that they have agreed on the following split of the proceeds under the Membership: $15,000.00 to BRE Iconic for reasonable attorney's fees and necessary costs incurred in this action; 50% of the remaining proceeds ($40,311.12) to Defendant DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc.; and after the aforementioned distributions, the proceeds remaining to Defendant Brigitte Daza, with any interest accrued in the Court's registry or bank account, from the date of deposit by BRE Iconic to the date of distribution by the Court, shall be paid solely to Brigitte Daza ($40,311.11, plus any accrued interest). Upon disbursement of the checks, this action shall be dismissed with prejudice as to all parties, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees, except as provided herein. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having reviewed Plaintiff's response #13 to the Order to Show Cause ("OSC") dated October 25, 2019 #12 , the Court hereby discharges the OSC. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Discharge of Liability, Award of Fees and Costs, Disbursement of Funds, and Dismissal of Case filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLCto Order to Show Cause, #12 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Maguire, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before November 8, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Brigitte Daza for lack of prosecution. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC, upon Defendant Brigitte Daza served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brigitte Daza, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Maguire, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $95,622.23 into the registry of the Court from Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP. Notice of Deposit Receipt number LA195703. (dmi)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc., Brigitte Daza. (gk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC of Check for deposit into Court's Registry. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deposit)(Maguire, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC. (Maguire, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC, (Maguire, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC. (Maguire, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24460712 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC. (Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC(pty:pla))(Maguire, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC v. DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRE Iconic LQR Owner LLC
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Represented By: Nancy Jerian Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigitte Daza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCX-Chol Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?