Yesenia Farfan v. Lending Club Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Yesenia Farhan and Yesenia Farfan
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Lendingclub Corporation and Lending Club Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv08113
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Lending Club shall have up to and including November 29, 2019, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (iv)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Lending Club Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Stacy Heather Rubin added to party Lending Club Corporation (pty:dft))(Rubin, Stacy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 11/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farfan, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Services Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farfan, upon Defendant Lending Club Corporation served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Services Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lending Club Corporation. (iv)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farfan. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08113 CJC (SSx). (esa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (lc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #4 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farhan. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLaintiff Yesenia Farhan. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farhan, (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yesenia Farhan. (Le, Sylvanna Uyen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24464935 - Fee: $400, filed by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF Yesenia Farhan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Attorney Sylvanna Uyen Le added to party Yesenia Farhan(pty:pla))(Le, Sylvanna Uyen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesenia Farfan v. Lending Club Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendingclub Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lending Club Corporation
Represented By: Stacy Heather Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Farhan
Represented By: Sylvanna Uyen Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Farfan
Represented By: Sylvanna Uyen H Le, Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?