Harold H. Paraiso v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Harold H. Paraiso
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security and F. Semaia
Case Number: 2:2019cv08116
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Accordingly, the $5.00 filing fee is ordered WAIVED. (hr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Harold H. Paraiso. (hr)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill S Casselman counsel for Respondent Department of Homeland Security. Adding Jill S. Casselman as counsel of record for Department of Homeland Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:res))(Casselman, Jill)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. that Respondent Department of Homeland Security file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/23/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (dc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition) (car)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE WAIVED), filed by Petitioner Harold H. Paraiso. (car) Modified on 11/5/2019 (hr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harold H. Paraiso v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold H. Paraiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Semaia
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?