Veleta Stevens v. Cachet Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Veleta Stevens
Defendant: FINANCIAL BUSINESS GROUP HOLDINGS and Cachet Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv08120
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings (Miller, Donald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Donald A. Miller In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings. (Miller, Donald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Donald)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff Veleta Stevens and Defendant Cachet Financial Services and Defendant Financial Business Group Holdings having stipulated that Defendant shall have until November 13, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, for good cause shown #18 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED. (lc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Financial Business Group Holdings answer now due 11/13/2019; Cachet Financial Services answer now due 11/13/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Financial Business Group Holdings; Cachet Financial Services.(Attorney Donald A Miller added to party Cachet Financial Services(pty:dft), Attorney Donald A Miller added to party Financial Business Group Holdings(pty:dft))(Miller, Donald)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veleta Stevens, upon Defendant Financial Business Group Holdings served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PARACORP INCORPORATED Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veleta Stevens, upon Defendant Cachet Financial Services served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PARACORP INCORPORATED Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veleta Stevens and designating Mike Arias as local counsel #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Coulson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veleta Stevens and designating Mike Arias as local counsel #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08120 ODW (JEMx). (esa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven D. Liddle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veleta Stevens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485263) filed by plaintiff Veleta Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arias, Mike)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Coulson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Veleta Stevens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485048) filed by plaintiff Veleta Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arias, Mike)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veleta Stevens, identifying Veleta Stevens; Arias Sanguinetti Wang & Torrijos, LLP; Liddle & Dubin, P.C.; Cachet Financial Services; Financial Business Group Holdings. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Coulson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven D. Liddle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veleta Stevens. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Veleta Stevens. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24466189 - Fee: $400, filed by Plainitff Veleta Stevens. (Attorney Alfredo Torrijos added to party Veleta Stevens(pty:pla))(Torrijos, Alfredo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veleta Stevens v. Cachet Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL BUSINESS GROUP HOLDINGS
Represented By: Donald A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cachet Financial Services
Represented By: Donald A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veleta Stevens
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Nicholas A Coulson
Represented By: Mike M Arias
Represented By: Steven D Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?