F4 Ventures, LLC v. Colm O'Callaghan et al
Plaintiff: F4 Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Colm O'Callaghan and Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv08126
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Colm O'Callaghan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Strom, Robb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Civil Cover Sheet was e-filed under the wrong event. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings and by selecting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71). No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
September 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Inclusive, Colm O'Callaghan. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff F4 Ventures, LLC. Filed in State Court on 8/19/19 Submitted with Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 [CIVIL COVER SHEET] Filed As NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC - West District, case number 19SMCV01468 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09192019, receipt number 26KA766R), filed by defendant Colm O'Callaghan.(Strom, Robb) Modified on 9/23/2019 (car).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC - West District, case number 19SMCV01468 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/19/2019, receipt number 26KA766R), filed by defendant Colm O'Callaghan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strom, Robb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying F4 VENTURES, LLC. (Attorney Robb M Strom added to party Colm O'Callaghan(pty:dft))(Strom, Robb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F4 Ventures, LLC v. Colm O'Callaghan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F4 Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Kirk Edward Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colm O'Callaghan
Represented By: Robb M Strom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?