Moreno Magana v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose U Moreno Magana
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), LA District Director Donna Campagnolo, Acting DirectorUSCIS Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Acting Secretary Kevin K McAleenan and LACountyFieldOff.Dir Nancy Alby
Case Number: 2:2019cv08282
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo counsel for Defendants Nancy Alby, Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Department of Homeland Security. Adding Fatima Lacayo as counsel of record for Nancy Alby, Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration, et al. (Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party Nancy Alby(pty:dft), Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party Donna Campagnolo(pty:dft), Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II(pty:dft), Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft), Attorney Fatimargentina M Lacayo added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Lacayo, Fatimargentina)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendants Nancy Alby, Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Department of Homeland Security. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Lacayo, Fatimargentina)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08282 PA (FFMx). (esa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Nancy Alby, Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States Department of Homeland Security. (jtil)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose U Moreno Magana. (Sobti, Sanjay)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose U Moreno Magana Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re: Miscellaneous Document #3 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Sobti, Sanjay)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons filed by Plaintiff Jose U Moreno Magana re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Sobti, Sanjay)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose U Moreno Magana. (Sobti, Sanjay)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Receipt No: 0973-24495599 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner/Plaintiff Jose U Moreno Magana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits of the Petition for Writ of Mandamus) (Attorney Sanjay Sobti added to party Jose U Moreno Magana(pty:pla))(Sobti, Sanjay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno Magana v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting DirectorUSCIS Kenneth T. Cuccinelli II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LACountyFieldOff.Dir Nancy Alby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose U Moreno Magana
Represented By: Sanjay Sobti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?