Robert Gaut v. Robert Wilkie Jr
Plaintiff: Robert Gaut
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE JR, SECRETARY OF UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS and Robert Wilkie, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08294
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Gaut, upon Defendant Robert Wilkie, Jr served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to B. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Sosa. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Frank M.. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pairavi, Edwin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Robert Wilkie, Jr. (ghap)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Gaut, identifying Robert Gaut. (Pairavi, Edwin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Gaut. (Pairavi, Edwin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Gaut. (Pairavi, Edwin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24496810 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Robert Gaut. (Attorney Edwin Pairavi added to party Robert Gaut (pty:pla))(Pairavi, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Gaut v. Robert Wilkie Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE JR, SECRETARY OF UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gaut
Represented By: Edwin Pairavi
Represented By: Joshua M Mohrsaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?