Don Young v. Cuckler, MD et al
Plaintiff: Don Young
Defendant: John Cuckler, MD, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC and Biomet Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv08380
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg counsel for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC. Adding Karen Firstenberg as counsel of record for Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, and Biomet Manufacturing LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, and Biomet Manufacturing LLC. (Attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg added to party Biomet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg added to party Biomet Manufacturing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg added to party Biomet Orthopedics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC(pty:dft))(Firstenberg, Karen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theodore O'Reilly counsel for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC. Adding Theodore O'Reilly as counsel of record for Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, and Biomet Manufacturing LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, and Biomet Manufacturing LLC. (Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Biomet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Biomet Manufacturing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Biomet Orthopedics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC(pty:dft))(O'Reilly, Theodore)
October 7, 2019 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon counsel for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC. Adding Tarifa B. Laddon as counsel of record for Boston Scientific Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party Biomet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party Biomet Manufacturing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party Biomet Orthopedics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC(pty:dft))(Laddon, Tarifa)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-8380 AB (JEMX). (esa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 56 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Indiana Northern
September 27, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:18-cv-00260-RLM-MGG, from U.S. District Court Northern District of Indiana (South Bend). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-08380-CAS (JEMx). (lh)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 53 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 46 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER: The #17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply is DENIED; the Cuckler defendants' #12 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/7/19. (jld) Modified on 3/18/2019 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 42 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 37 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 26 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 23 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 19 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Don Young re #14 Response to Motion to Dismiss Cuckler Defendants (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Erika Banfelder)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Don Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Surreply)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Don Young. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele S Stephan PHV on behalf of Don Young (Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 9 ***WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. SEE #12 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 7 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Don Young. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3537171.), filed by Don Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Don Young v. Cuckler, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cuckler, MD
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Karen Michelle Firstenberg
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Karen Michelle Firstenberg
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Karen Michelle Firstenberg
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Karen Michelle Firstenberg
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Young
Represented By: Altom M Maglio
Represented By: Michele S Stephan
Represented By: Ilyas Sayeg
Represented By: Brian Franciskato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?