North American Meat Institute v. Xavier Becerra et al
Plaintiff: North American Meat Institute
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Karen Ross, Susan Fanelli and Dr. Sonia Angell
Intervenor Defendant: Farm Sanctuary, Animal Legal Defense Fund, The Humane Society of the United States, The Humane League, Compassion in World Farming USA, Animal Equality and Compassion Over Killing
Amicus Curiae: Association of California Egg Farmers and The States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Oklahoma, South Carolina and Utah
Case Number: 2:2019cv08569
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), #45 by Defendant-Intervenors Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Compassion Over Killing, Compassion in World Farming USA, Farm Sanctuary, The Humane League, The Humane Society of the United States. The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: MOTION: Judgment on the Pleadings ( follow system prompts to select Date, Time and Judge). Due to incorrect event NO Motion, NOR Motion hearing was set on Judge's Motion calendar. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Defendant-Intervenors Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Compassion Over Killing, Compassion in World Farming USA, Farm Sanctuary, The Humane League, The Humane Society of the United States. FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagman, Bruce)
November 27, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Sonia Angell, Xavier Becerra, Karen Ross. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Wise, R)
November 22, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #15 , AND PROPOSED DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE #25 . The Court GRANTS intervenors' motion to intervene in this action, and DENIES plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. (lc). Modified on 11/22/2019 (lc).
November 19, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff North American Meat Institute for Court Reporter. Court will contact Claudia Espinoza at cvespinoza@sidley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Commons, Sean)
November 18, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #15 PROPOSED DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE #25 . Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel, as stated in Court and on the record, and counsel argue. Court Reporter: Lauria Elias. (lc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 40 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Amicus The States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Oklahoma, South Carolina and Utah. (lc)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND AMICUS BRIEF OF INDIANA, ALABAMA, ARKANSAS, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, MISSOURI, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, AND UTAH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF #32 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 38 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) #25 filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Commons, Sean)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Fisher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, designating Edward S Renwick as local counsel. (bm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Kian J. Hudson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, designating Edward S Renwick as local counsel. (bm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Brief of Idiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Oklahoma, South Carolina, And Utah In Support Of Plaintiffs Request For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief #32 , previously scheduled for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled. Motion hearing is advanced to 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Any opposition shall be filed on or before 11/12/2019. No replies will be accepted.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 5, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24723739) #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kian J. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24723660) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Brief of Idiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Oklahoma, South Carolina, And Utah In Support Of Plaintiffs Request For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief filed by Amici Curiae North American Meat Institute. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renwick, Edward)
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24723739) filed by Amici Curiae North American Meat Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Renwick, Edward)
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kian J. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24723660) filed by Amici Curiae North American Meat Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Edward S Renwick added to party North American Meat Institute(pty:pla)) (Renwick, Edward)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining the implementation and enforcement of Proposition 12's sales ban, California Health & Safety Code Sec. 25990(b), as applied to pork and veal imported into California from other St #15 filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Commons, Sean)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 Amicus Brief of Association of California Egg Farmers in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This Court should deny Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction. Re: Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief #27 . (twdb)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF OF ASSOCIATION OF CALIFORNIA EGG FARMERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder #23 . (twdb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) #25 . The Court is in receipt of proposed defendants-intervenors motion for leave to intervene #25 filed 10/29/2019)(Motion) which was noticed for hearing on 11/18/2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1, motions must be filed not later than 28 days before the noticed hearing date. The Court accordingly construes proposed defendants-intervenors request for a 11/18/2019 hearing date as a request to shorten time. The Court will GRANT that request, and the Motion will be heard on 11/18/2019. Any opposition to the Motion shall be due 11/11/2019. No replies shall be permitted. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) filed by Defendant-Intervenor The Humane Society of the United States, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, The Humane League, Farm Sanctuary, Compassion in World Farming USA, Compassion Over Killing. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Josh Balk in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration of Gene Baur in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration of Sarah Hanneken in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #5 Declaration of Will Lowrey in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #6 Declaration of Wendy Watts in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #7 Declaration of Stephen Wells in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #8 Declaration of Cynthia von Schlichten in Support of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #9 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #11 Proposed Order Granting Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene, #12 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party The Humane Society of the United States(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party Animal Legal Defense Fund(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party Animal Equality(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party The Humane League(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party Farm Sanctuary(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party Compassion in World Farming USA(pty:intvd), Attorney Bruce Andrew Wagman added to party Compassion Over Killing(pty:intvd)) (Wagman, Bruce)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining the implementation and enforcement of Proposition 12's sales ban, California Health & Safety Code Sec. 25990(b), as applied to pork and veal imported into California from other St #15 filed by Defendants Sonia Angell, Xavier Becerra, Karen Ross. (Wise, R)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief (Unopposed) filed by Movant Association of California Egg Farmers. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief) (Attorney Brian M Boynton added to party Association of California Egg Farmers(pty:bkmov)) (Boynton, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER #21 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court orders the following briefing and hearing schedule: November 27, 2019: Defendants to file motion to dismiss; January 14, 2020: Plaintiff to file opposition to Defendants motion to;dismiss;January 27, 2020: Defendants to file reply in support of motion to dismiss; February 24, 2020 (10:00 A.M.): Hearing on Defendants motion to dismiss. (lc) Modified on 10/24/2019 (lc).
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Susan Fanelli answer now due 11/27/2019; Karen Ross answer now due 11/27/2019; Xavier Becerra answer now due 11/27/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Susan Fanelli; Karen Ross; Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney R Matthew Wise added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney R Matthew Wise added to party Susan Fanelli(pty:dft), Attorney R Matthew Wise added to party Karen Ross(pty:dft))(Wise, R)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, upon Defendant Susan Fanelli served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laurna Costelli, Legal in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Commons, Sean)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, upon Defendant Karen Ross served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruthdale Keli, Legal in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Commons, Sean)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JP Sattler, Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Commons, Sean)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Zidicky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute and designating Sean A. Commons as local counsel #6 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (lc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. McArthur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute and designating Sean A. Commons as local counsel #7 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (lc) Modified on 10/11/2019 (lc).
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining the implementation and enforcement of Proposition 12's sales ban, California Health & Safety Code Sec. 25990(b), as applied to pork and veal imported into California from other States and countries . Motion filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Casey Lynn Gallimore, #2 Declaration Dr. Keith E. Belk, #3 Declaration Dale Bakke, #4 Declaration Anthony Catelli, Jr., #5 Declaration Brian Friesen, #6 Declaration Cory Bollum, #7 Declaration Robert Darrell, #8 Declaration Todd Neff, #9 Declaration Joshua L. Rennells, #10 Declaration Matthew Turner) (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. correcting Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,, #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Karen Ross. (lh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Susan Fanelli. (lh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (lh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. McArthur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24553685) #7 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Zidlicky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24553649) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. McArthur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24553685) filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Zidlicky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North American Meat Institute (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24553649) filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute, (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Commons, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24553419 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff North American Meat Institute. (Attorney Sean A Commons added to party North American Meat Institute(pty:pla))(Commons, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Meat Institute v. Xavier Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: R Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ross
Represented By: R Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sonia Angell
Represented By: R Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Meat Institute
Represented By: Paul J Zidlicky
Represented By: Eric D McArthur
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Farm Sanctuary
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: The Humane League
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Compassion in World Farming USA
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Animal Equality
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Compassion Over Killing
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of California Egg Farmers
Represented By: Brian M Boynton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Oklahoma, South Carolina and Utah
Represented By: Edward S Renwick
Represented By: Kian J Hudson
Represented By: Thomas M Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?