Peter Guinan v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848 et al
Plaintiff: Peter Guinan
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848, Shippers Transport Express, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive and International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848
Case Number: 2:2019cv08585
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The hearing on the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Peter Guinan #9 , set for 11/26/2019, at 10:00 am, is hereby vacated and taken OFF-CALENDAR. The motion is suitable for decision without oral argument and stands SUBMITTED. No appearance necessary on 11/26/2019. The Court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY In Support Of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff Peter Guinan. (Wyatt, Andrew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848. (Kierig, Stephanie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES ON (1) PLAINTIFF PETER GUINANS MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT, AND (2) DEFENDANT TEAMSTERS LOCAL 848S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is continued from November 12, 2019 to November 26, 2019; 2. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is continued from November 12, 2019 to November 26, 2019;3. Local 848s opposition to the Motion to Remand is due to be filed with the Court by November 5, 2019; 4. Plaintiffs reply in support of his Motion to Remand is due to be filed with the Court no later than November 12, 2019;5. The hearing on Local 848s Motion to Dismiss is continued from December 10, 2019 to January 14, 2020; 6. Plaintiffs opposition to the Motion to Dismiss is due to be filed with the Court by December 24, 2019; 7. Local 848s reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss is due to be filed with the Court no later than December 31, 2019. (shb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Continue (1) PLAINTIFF PETER GUINANS MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT, AND (2) DEFENDANT TEAMSTERS LOCAL 848S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM from (1) November 12, 2019 and (2) December 10, 2019 to (1) November 26, 2019 and (2) January 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kierig, Stephanie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Peter Guinan. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Wyatt, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Eric Tate, #3 Declaration of Renee Q. Sanchez, #4 Declaration of Stephanie A. Kierig, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service) (Kierig, Stephanie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08585 RSWL(JCx). (rn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on October 8, 2019. (Kierig, Stephanie)
October 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Peter Guinan, upon Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848 served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mayann Bancroft Manager Authorized to take papers in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/25/19 Submitted with attachment 4 to notice of removal #1 (car)
October 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Inclusive, International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848, Shippers Transport Express, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Peter Guinan. Filed in State Court on 8/2/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848, identifying Hudson Insurance Company. (Kierig, Stephanie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848. (Kierig, Stephanie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV27369 Receipt No: 0973-24557327 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Proof of Service of Summons) (Attorney Stephanie Alexis Kierig added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848(pty:dft))(Kierig, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Guinan v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Union Local Number 848
Represented By: Stephanie Alexis Kierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shippers Transport Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 848
Represented By: Renee Sanchez
Represented By: Dennis J Hayes
Represented By: Stephanie Alexis Kierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Guinan
Represented By: Andrew M Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?