Maria Sanchez Magallanes v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Maria Sanchez Magallanes
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv08600
Filed: October 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-8600 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Pena, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Sanchez Magallanes, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Pena, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (mba)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (mba)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Granting #4 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (mba)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
October 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Maria Sanchez Magallanes. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Maria Sanchez Magallanes. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan)
October 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Sanchez Magallanes. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Maria Sanchez Magallanes (pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Sanchez Magallanes v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sanchez Magallanes
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?