Jiae Lee v. Dong Yeoun Lee et al
Plaintiff: Jiae Lee
Defendant: Grace Min and Dong Yeoun Lee
Case Number: 2:2019cv08814
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike 1. to strike scandalous and irrelevant matters from complaint 2. to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action for unjust enrichment Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 jointly filed by Damon Lee and #13 filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee. (Van Loon, Erica)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/31/2020. (ake)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE SCANDALOUS AND IRRELEVANT MATTERS FROM THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from June 8, 2020 to March 16, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jaenam Coe in support of Joint Motion by Damon Lee and Grace Min to Strike Scandalous Matters and to Dismiss Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike 1. to strike scandalous and irrelevant matters from complaint 2. to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action for unjust enrichment Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 jointly filed by Damon Lee and #13 filed by Defendant Dong Yeoun Lee. (Attorney Jaenam J Coe added to party Dong Yeoun Lee(pty:dft))(Coe, Jaenam)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike 1. to strike scandalous and irrelevant matters from complaint 2. to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action for unjust enrichment Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 jointly filed by Damon Lee and filed by Defendant Grace Min. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attorney Jaenam J Coe added to party Grace Min(pty:dft)) (Coe, Jaenam)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee, upon Defendant Dong Yeoun Lee served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nancy Lee - Wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee, upon Defendant Grace Min served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Grace Min - Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08814 JAK(FFMx). (rn)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Grace Min. (ghap)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dong Yeoun Lee. (ghap)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee, identifying Jiae Lee (Plaintiff), Dong Yeoun Lee (Defendant), Grace Min (Defendant).. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24601631 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jiae Lee. (Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party Jiae Lee(pty:pla))(Van Loon, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiae Lee v. Dong Yeoun Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiae Lee
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Joshua J Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Min
Represented By: Jaenam J Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dong Yeoun Lee
Represented By: Jaenam J Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?