Veronica Mathias v. 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Mathias
Defendant: 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC, Does 1-100, 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company and 1701 PARTNERS, a business of unknown form
Case Number: 2:2019cv08842
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nakano, Jarrod)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: SECOND Amended Complaint/Petition #24 , Summons Request #26 , for the following reasons: Review discrepancy issued on docket no. 29, refile competently and correctly. The Court will NOT entertain messy and confusing filings. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiff Veronica Mathiass Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #17 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant 1701 Broadway Partner, LLC, a California limited liability company is hereby DISMISSED. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:SECOND Amended Complaint/Petition #24 , Summons Request #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Leave of court required for filing. Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer has already amended complaint once; Currently Clerk unable to find filing nor order permitting the filing of a Second Amended Complaint. Clerk unable to determine the propriety of filing the Second Amended Complaint and in addition the request for summons thereof is Missing the complete case number.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 Second Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias, (Nakano, Jarrod)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 [STRICKEN PER 12/13/19 ORDER DOCKET NO. 30].Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #24 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod) Modified on 12/13/2019 (lc).
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Nakano, Jarrod)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 [STRICKEN PER 12/13/19 ORDER DOCKET NO. 30].SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant 1701 PARTNERS, a business of unknown form amending Amended Complaint/Petition #16 , filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias(Nakano, Jarrod) Modified on 12/13/2019 (lc).
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 as to defendant 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company. (lc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,, #21 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #18 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Caption on summons is not verbatim to the First amended complaint no. 16... (see does 2-100 on summons, whereas First amended complaint has does 1-100); (filer dismissed the duplicate 1701 Partners LLC which is not applicable to the doe parties as cited). When resubmitted please include on the form " On the First Amended Complaint" near the summons title.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias, (Nakano, Jarrod)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #16 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Nakano, Jarrod)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias(Nakano, Jarrod)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of an alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) and a claim for damages pursuant to Californias Unruh Act. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel to the Courts Order to Show Cause. The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim. The Court therefore dismisses that claim without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. Section 1367 (c)(4). (shb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias, upon Defendant 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 1701 BROADWAY PARTNERS, LLC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Veronica Mathias re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathiasto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #8 (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Timothy G. McFarlin re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathiasto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #9 (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than October 29, 2019. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of those claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (lc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC. (et)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias, (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Nakano, Jarrod)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24606282 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Veronica Mathias. (Attorney Jarrod Yutaka Nakano added to party Veronica Mathias(pty:pla))(Nakano, Jarrod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veronica Mathias v. 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1701 Broadway Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1701 PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1701 PARTNERS, a business of unknown form
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Mathias
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?