Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC and Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Defendant: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED-INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, A.F.L.-C.I.O. LOCAL 675
Case Number: 2:2019cv08853
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. As set out in its concurrently issued Order, the Court finds that this dispute is not ripe for judicial review. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #11 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Union's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Tesoro may file a subsequent challenge to the Arbitrator's ruling after the Award is finalized. (iv)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Adams, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jay Edward Smith on behalf of Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675 (Attorney Jay Edward Smith added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Joshua)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Adams, Joshua)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675, identifying Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC; Jason Davis; and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (Attorney Joshua B Adams added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675(pty:dft))(Adams, Joshua)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675. (iv)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, (Mirrafati, Kamran)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Mirrafati, Kamran)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24607780 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Kamran Mirrafati added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC(pty:pla))(Mirrafati, Kamran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied-Industrial and Service Workers International Union, A.F.L.-C.I.O. Local 675
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Kamran Mirrafati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Kamran Mirrafati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED-INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, A.F.L.-C.I.O. LOCAL 675
Represented By: Jay Edward Smith
Represented By: Joshua B Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?