Natural Pack, Inc. et al v. Syndicate Sales, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Natural Pack, Inc.
Defendant: Syndicate Sales, Inc., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Del Demaree, Jr., Guy Markus, Michael A. Williams, Does 1-10 and David C. Clark
Case Number: 2:2019cv08867
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL OTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #29 EX PARTE APPLICATION: DENIED. (bm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 Opposition to Ex Parte Application re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The #29 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ira M. Steinberg, #2 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira)
December 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The #29 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanderhoof, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lunsford Syndicate Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #2 Declaration OF Laura Shinall) (Vanderhoof, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lunsford, designating Thomas S Kidde as local counsel. (bm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lansford, designating Thomas S Kidde as local counsel. (bm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., re Sealed Document, #25 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction served on 11/12/19. (Steinberg, Ira)
November 11, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT Redacted Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #24 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #23 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Request for Judicial Notice)(Steinberg, Ira)
November 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Steinberg, Ira)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #14 APPLICATION (bm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 11/7/2019, Receipt No. 26LCG1SP) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Applicaton of Non-Resident Attorney In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kidde, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E."Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice F #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E."Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24745500) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kidde, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #17 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #16 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #15 served on November 5, 2019. (Steinberg, Ira)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., (Steinberg, Ira)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #14 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document UNREDACTED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Steinberg, Ira)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #14 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc..(Steinberg, Ira)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #14 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc..(Steinberg, Ira)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Steinberg, Ira)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc... (Steinberg, Ira)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant Guy Markus. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Guy Markus in Support thereof, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Clint D Robison added to party Guy Markus(pty:dft)) (Robison, Clint)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss Under F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Alternative, to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), #2 Declaration of Michael A. Williams In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #3 Declaration of Guy Markus n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #4 Declaration of Del Demarre, Jr., n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #5 Declaration of Larua D. Shinall n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #6 Declaration of Thomas C. Clark n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #7 Declaration of Thomas C. Lunsford n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Alternative, to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a)) (Kidde, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number and judge's initials are missing from caption of attached document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc.. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants' David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., identifying Natural Pack, Inc.; Syndicate Sales, Inc.; Del Demaree, Jr.; Laura D. Shinall; David C. Clark; Michael A. Williams; Thomas C. Lundsford; Guy Markus. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet lacks signature. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 10/15/2019, receipt number 26KSUB62), filed by Defendants Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Del Demaree, Jr., Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams.(Vanderhoof, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 * CIVIL COVER SHEET * attached instead of Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams, identifying Natural Pack, Inc; Syndicate Sales, Inc.; Del Demaree, Jr.; Laura D. Shinall; Michael A. Williams; Thomas C. Lunsford; Guy Markus. (Vanderhoof, Brian) Modified on 10/16/2019 (esa).
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superiour Court of the State of California County of Los Angeles, Central District, case number 19STCV32476 Receipt No: 0973-24609981 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Del Demaree, Jr., Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Del Demaree, Jr.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Thomas C. Lunsford(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Laura D. Shinall(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Syndicate Sales, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Michael A. Williams(pty:bkmov))(Vanderhoof, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Pack, Inc. et al v. Syndicate Sales, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Lunsford
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura D. Shinall
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Demaree, Jr.
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Markus
Represented By: Clint D Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Williams
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Clark
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Thomas S Kidde
Represented By: Daniel C DeCarlo
Represented By: Donald E Lake, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Pack, Inc.
Represented By: Ira M Steinberg
Represented By: Pierce Henry O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?