Daniel Esquivel et al v. Manuel Morales et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Esquivel, Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC, Eugenio Gonzales and Daniel Esquivel
Defendant: Manuel Morales, Pedro Marques Jr., Pedro Marques and Enrique Hernandez Calvillo
Case Number: 2:2019cv08870
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case // Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Defendant Pedro Marques for lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) and Improper Venu Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3); Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration in Support thereof; Proposed Order filed by Defendant Pedro Marques. (Attorney Lisbeth Bosshart Merrill added to party Pedro Marques(pty:dft)) (Merrill, Lisbeth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pedro Marques answer now due 12/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiffs Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC; Daniel Esquivel; Eugenio Gonzales; Alfredo Esquivel.(Eyre, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08870 CJC(FFMx). (rn)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Enrique Hernandez Calvillo, Pedro Marques, Pedro Marques Jr., Manuel Morales. (lh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Alfredo Esquivel, Daniel Esquivel, Eugenio Gonzales, Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC. (Eyre, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Esquivel, Daniel Esquivel, Eugenio Gonzales, Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC. (Eyre, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Esquivel, Daniel Esquivel, Eugenio Gonzales, Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC, (Eyre, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Alfredo Esquivel, Daniel Esquivel, Eugenio Gonzales, Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC. (Eyre, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24610135 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC, Daniel Esquivel, Eugenio Gonzales, Alfredo Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Alfredo Esquivel(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Daniel Esquivel(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Eugenio Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC(pty:pla))(Eyre, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Esquivel et al v. Manuel Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Marques Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Marques
Represented By: Lisbeth Bosshart Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez Calvillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Esquivel
Represented By: Steven J Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Rieleros del Norte, LLC
Represented By: Steven J Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Gonzales
Represented By: Steven J Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Esquivel
Represented By: Steven J Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?