Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. v. Ranker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Ranker, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08875
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPONDTO COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court approves the stipulated request and ORDERS as follows: the deadline for defendant Ranker, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to and including January 9, 2020. (shb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/9/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkowski, Peter)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lewis E Hudnell, III on behalf of Defendant Ranker, Inc. (Hudnell, Lewis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ranker, Inc. answer now due 12/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc..(Perkowski, Peter)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08875 CBM(JPRx). (rn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ranker, Inc. (car)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., identifying Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. and Ranker, Inc. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24610805 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Peter E Perkowski added to party Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Perkowski, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. v. Ranker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranker, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis E Hudnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Peter E Perkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?