Taylor Farms California, Inc. v. Coopers Cold Food, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Farms California, Inc.
Defendant: Adam Cooper and Coopers Cold Food, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Farmers Link, Inc. and Monterey Mushrooms, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: Cooper Cold Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08924
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS OF TAYLOR FARMS CALIFORNIA, INC. and MONTEREY MUSHROOMS, INC. AND FARMERS LINK, INC., #8 , by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The deadline to file an Answer to the Complaints is extended from December 2, 2019 (Adam Cooper) and December 10, 2019 (Cooper Cold Foods, Inc. and Adam Cooper) to January 6, 2020. (shb)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The document is stricken. The proof of service filed 12/4/2019 is incomplete and missing the title page. Correct and refile as soon as possible. (shb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 01/06/2020 re Intervenor Complaint #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Adam Cooper, Cooper Cold Foods, Inc., Coopers Cold Food, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaints)(Attorney Adam D H Grant added to party Adam Cooper(pty:intvd), Attorney Adam D H Grant added to party Cooper Cold Foods, Inc.(pty:intvd), Attorney Adam D H Grant added to party Coopers Cold Food, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grant, Adam)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc., upon Defendant Adam Cooper served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc., upon Defendant Coopers Cold Food, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam Cooper, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monterey Mushrooms, Inc., upon Defendant Cooper Cold Foods, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam Cooper, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER G-112-B, SEE [DKT 20]. PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monterey Mushrooms, Inc., upon Defendant Adam Cooper served on 11/10/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam Cooper, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence) Modified on 12/13/2019 (shb).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (shb)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Intervenor Complaint #10 as to Defendants Adam Cooper, Cooper Cold Foods, Inc. (shb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Intervenor Complaint #10 filed by Intervening Plaintiffs Farmers Link, Inc., Monterey Mushrooms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request - Adam Cooper)(Meuers, Lawrence)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Defendants Adam Cooper, Cooper Cold Foods, Inc., filed by Intervening Plaintiff Monterey Mushrooms, Inc., Farmers Link, Inc..(Meuers, Lawrence)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, STIPULATION to Allow Monterey Mushrooms, Inc. and Farmers Link, Inc. to Intervene for the purpose of enforcing their rights under PACA and the statutory trust against Defendant, #8 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is approved and the relief requested is hereby granted. The Complaint in Intervention may be filed and served. Intervening Plaintiffs Mushrooms, Inc. and Farmers Link, Inc. shall file and serve the Complaint in Intervention on Cooper Cold Foods, Inc. and Adam Cooper in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4, or under California Code of Civil Procedure 415.10 et seq. (shb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION to Allow Monterey Mushrooms, Inc. and Farmers Link, Inc. to Intervene for the purpose of enforcing their rights under PACA and the statutory trust against Defendant filed by Intervening Plaintiffs Monterey Mushrooms, Inc., Farmers Link, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Intervention, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Lawrence H Meuers added to party Monterey Mushrooms, Inc.(pty:intvp), Attorney Lawrence H Meuers added to party Farmers Link, Inc.(pty:intvp))(Meuers, Lawrence)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Adam Cooper, Coopers Cold Food, Inc. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc., (Botta, Bartholomew)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24618583 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc.. (Attorney Bartholomew M Botta added to party Taylor Farms California, Inc.(pty:pla))(Botta, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Farms California, Inc. v. Coopers Cold Food, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Farms California, Inc.
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Represented By: June T Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopers Cold Food, Inc.
Represented By: Adam D H Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Farmers Link, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence H Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Monterey Mushrooms, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence H Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Cooper Cold Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Adam D H Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?