United States of America v. $47,680.00 In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $47,680.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2019cv08935
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 10/21/2019 and 10/22/2019 upon Defendant $47,680.00 In U.S. Currency last date of publication 11/19/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08935 PA(JEMx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Warrant for seizure returned #8 . (lc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) and Notice #1 upon $47,680.00 In U.S. Currency. Remarks: seized defendant currency 30,670.00 and 17,010.00 on10/29/19. (lc)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08935 CAS(JEMx). (rn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of $47,680.00 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (car)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum by U.S. Attorney re: Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schonbachler, Katharine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 10/17/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Schonbachler, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $47,680.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $47,680.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?