Alexander S. Ventura v. Neil McDowell
Petitioner: Alexander S. Ventura
Respondent: Neil McDowell
Case Number: 2:2019cv08965
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred to the Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Western Division*.*255 East Temple Street**Los Angeles, CA 90012*. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #1 Transfer Order) (ag). (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer This Action to United States District Court for the Central District of California by Neil McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Rogers, Daniel) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Brian Rogers on behalf of Neil McDowell (Rogers, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Brian Rogers added to party Neil McDowell(pty:res) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Filing fee: $5, receipt number CAS114424, Paid on 8/14/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER reopening case and setting briefing schedule. Motion to dismiss by Respondent due no later than 9/30/2019. Opposition by Petitioner due no later than 10/30/2019. Answer by Respondent due not later than 9/30/2019. Traverse by Petitioner due no later than 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/01/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 application to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/30/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander S. Ventura. (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he MUST SUBMIT, no later than 8/10/2018, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee. (Blank in forma pauperis application mailed to Petitioner). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/12/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-04001. Original file received electronically (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 6/7/2019.] [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent Neil McDowell amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 , filed by Petitioner Alexander S. Ventura. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 6/7/2019.] [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: (see attached order) Petitioner is ORDERED to file a First Amended Petition on the standard form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The clerk is directed to send petitioner a blank Central District 2254 habeas petition form for this purpose. (2254 petition attached) (Attachments: #1 state petition) (jm) [Transferred from California Central on 6/7/2019.] [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 6/7/2019.] [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Alexander S. Ventura. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 6/7/2019.] [Transferred from California Southern on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander S. Ventura v. Neil McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Neil McDowell
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel Brian Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexander S. Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?