Arthur Rosengren v. Curtiss-Wright Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Rosengren
Defendant: The Boeing Company, United Technologies Corporation, Curtiss-Wright Corporation, O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Adel Precision Products Corp., DAP, Inc., SOCO West, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Western Auto Supply Company, Union Carbide Corporation, -, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company, L.P., Soco-Lynch Corporation, CSK Auto, Inc. and Brenntag West, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09064
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury Trial is set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference is set for 6/8/2020 at 3:00 PM. (pc)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE: PARTIES STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE VIA FILE & SERVE XPRESS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. In this action only, all service of documents not filed with the Court, including but not limited to, discovery requests, discovery responses, deposition notices, disclosures, and correspondence, may be made by electronic service via File & Serve Xpress. Electronic service made by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time on any business day shall be considered equivalent to personal service on that business day. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 67 Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.'s Notice of Interested Parties; Certificate of Service NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P., (Martin, Nicolas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 66 (Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.(pty:dft))(Martin, Nicolas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.. Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.'s Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A in Support of Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.'s Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint)(Martin, Nicolas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 64 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The initial status conference for 12/9/2019 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2019 Filing 63 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of FRCP Rule 26(a)(1)(a) filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Schatz, Russell)
December 6, 2019 Filing 62 INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Flinders, Ethan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 61 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Excusing Lead Counsel from In Person Attendance at Upcoming Status Conference filed by Defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Deborah)
December 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporation. [Filed as Exh. A to doc. no. 57](mrgo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 60 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
December 2, 2019 Filing 59 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Witnesses, Documents, Damages, Insurance filed by Defendant Henry Company LLC (Gallagher, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 58 Initial DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.'s Initial Disclosure Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. (Martin, Nicolas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Smith, Deborah)
December 2, 2019 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Smith, Deborah)
December 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Deborah A Smith on behalf of Defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Attorney Deborah A Smith added to party Curtiss-Wright Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Deborah)
November 25, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION for Order Service via File & Serve Xpress filed by Plaintiff Arthur Rosengren. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Willick, Marc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party, #52 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initiate judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 52 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. The Defendant does not consent. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Hugo on behalf of Defendant O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. identifying O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., identifying O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Attorney Edward R Hugo added to party O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to FRCP Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, (Schatz, Russell)
November 21, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand forJury Trial filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Schatz, Russell)
November 21, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Schatz, Russell)
November 21, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for Genuine Parts Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 20, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Parker, Deborah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conformed State Court Answer, #2 Exhibit Conformed Jury Demand)(Flinders, Ethan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Dana L. Burch as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 20, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company, identifying Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Flinders, Ethan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ethan L Flinders counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Ethan L. Flinders as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Ethan L Flinders added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Flinders, Ethan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Graham counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Michael A. Graham as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Statement #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initiate judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc..(Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 30 STATEMENT of Consent or Declination to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant The Boeing Company (Karren, Brent)
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 JOINDER filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Joinder)(Glazier, Guy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation, identifying Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attorney Guy P Glazier added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft))(Glazier, Guy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and Imo Holdings, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel James Kelly counsel for Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. Adding Daniel J. Kelly as counsel of record for Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attorney Daniel James Kelly added to party Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Kelly, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Valeria Golodnitska counsel for Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. Adding Valeria Golodnitska as counsel of record for Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attorney Valeria Golodnitska added to party Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Golodnitska, Valeria)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 JOINDER filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Brosamle, Anthony)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Brosamle, Anthony)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, (Brosamle, Anthony)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation.(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph L Greenslade counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding Joseph L. Greenslade as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Greenslade, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying The Dow Chemical Company. (Greenslade, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, with JURY DEMAND PERSONAL INJURY filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation.(Attorney Joseph L Greenslade added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Greenslade, Joseph)
October 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by defendant DAP, Inc. [Submitted as Exh. A to doc. no. 14-1](Attorney Monica Williams Monroe added to party DAP, Inc.(pty:dft))(mrgo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DAP, Inc., identifying USG Industries, Inc., La Mirada Products Co., Inc.. (Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party DAP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Defendant DAP, Inc. k/n/a La Mirada Products Co., Inc.'s Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant DAP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garratt, Justin)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/9/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09064 SVW(Ex). (rn)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 5 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
October 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap)
October 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Adel Precision Products Corp., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, DAP, Inc., Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Genuine Parts Company, Henry Company LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., SOCO West, Inc., The Boeing Company, The W.W. Henry Company, L.P., United Technologies Corporation, Western Auto Supply Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Arthur Rosengren. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(ghap) Modified on 10/24/2019 (ghap).
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of INTERESTED PARTIES (LOCAL RULE 7.1-1) filed by Defendant The Boeing Company (Young, Kristi)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young counsel for Defendant The Boeing Company. Adding Kristi L.K. Young as counsel of record for The Boeing Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Young, Kristi)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Defendant The Boeing Company.(Karren, Brent)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER filed by Defendant The Boeing Company joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Karren, Brent)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brent Marshall Karren counsel for Defendant The Boeing Company. Adding Brent M. Karren as counsel of record for The Boeing Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attorney Brent Marshall Karren added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Karren, Brent)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation (Garratt, Justin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV35225 Receipt No: 0973-24646528 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party United Technologies Corporation(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur Rosengren v. Curtiss-Wright Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Represented By: Kristi Leigh Kasey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Deborah A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Maria Parker
Represented By: Guy P Glazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Precision Products Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Monica Williams Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Company LLC
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Brian J Triplett
Represented By: William M Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Ethan L Flinders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation, -
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Joseph L Greenslade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Emily Kate Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The W.W. Henry Company, L.P.
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Rosengren
Represented By: Marc Ian Willick
Represented By: Benno B Ashrafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?