Melissa Jefferson v. Justin Raisen et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Jefferson
Defendant: Jeremiah Raisen, Heavy Duty Music Publishing, Justin Rothman, Justin Raisen, Does 1-10 and Heavy Duty LLC
Counter Claimant: Justin Yves Rothman
Counter Defendant: Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller, Steven Cheung and Roes
Case Number: 2:2019cv09107
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 96 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Jesse St. John Geller, Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arato, Cynthia)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #89 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. For her part, Lizzo states that she wishes to voluntarily dismiss her claims without prejudice because duplicative, mirror-image claims could confuse the jury. Dismissal without prejudice is the default, unless Counterclaimants show they will incur legal prejudice. They have not. Accordingly, Lizzo's motion is GRANTED. Lizzo's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. (lom)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Melissa Jefferson's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff and Counterdefendant's Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) #89 presently scheduled for hearing on December 3, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2021 Filing 93 REPLY In Further Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint per Rule 41(a)(2) #89 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Julian S. Brod)(Arato, Cynthia)
November 12, 2021 Filing 92 Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint per Rule 41(a)(2) #89 filed by Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence Iser in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal)(Iser, Lawrence)
October 22, 2021 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint per Rule 41(a)(2) #89 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arato, Cynthia)
October 22, 2021 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Julian S. Brod in support of motion to dismiss per Rule 41(a)(2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint per Rule 41(a)(2) #89 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Arato, Cynthia)
October 22, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint per Rule 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Melissa Jefferson. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Arato, Cynthia)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY AND MOTION FILING DEADLINES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon the parties' Joint Motion #87 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion is GRANTED. The non-expert discovery cut-off is continued to 6/17/2022; the deadline for initial affirmative expert disclosure and reports is continued to 7/15/2022; deadline for rebuttal expert disclosure and reports is continued to 8/5/2022; the expert discovery cut-off is continued to 9/16/2022; the dispositive motion cut-off is continued to 10/1/2022; the last date for hearing dispositive motions is continued to 11/18/2022; and the settlement conference completion date is continued to 12/16/2022. (gk)
October 5, 2021 Filing 87 Joint APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 9/16/2022 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants Jesse St. John Geller, Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Arato Declaration, #2 Declaration Iser Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Arato, Cynthia)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Counterdefendant's Ex Parte Application #85 is GRANTED. Jury Trial is continued to 2/28/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 1/31/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. The deadline for all pretrial filings is continued to 1/10/2023. The date for the filing of oppositions to any motions in limine is continued to 1/17/2023. (gk)
July 1, 2021 Filing 85 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Trial from May 31, 2022 to February 27, 2023, EX PARTE APPLICATION to Set Trial Date on February 27, 2023 filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brod, Julian)
May 12, 2021 Filing 84 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, filed by Counterdefendant Jesse St. John Geller.(Arato, Cynthia)
May 12, 2021 Filing 83 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Melissa Jefferson.(Arato, Cynthia)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/5/2022. Joint status report re settlement due by 4/12/2022. (gk)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 5/31/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
May 5, 2021 Filing 80 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (UPDATED) ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman.. (Korn, Gregory)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Because Counterclaimants continue to claim co-ownership of Truth Hurts based solely on their contributions to a prior independent work, Lizzo's second Motion to Dismiss the first, third, fourth, and fifth amended counterclaims #60 is GRANTED. Given that the deficiencies in the Counterclaims have not been remedied in the FAA, the Court DISMISSES with prejudice Counterclaimants' first cause of action for declaratory relief as to their ownership of Truth Hurts, as well as their third, fourth, and fifth causes of action to the extent they are derived from the first. Counter-defendants shall file their Answer to the remaining counterclaims by no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. The parties shall meet and confer and file an updated Joint Rule 26(f) Report within one week of the date of this Order. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Julian S. Brod to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson p/k/a Lizzo, designating Max J. Sprecher as local counsel #77 . (gk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 77 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Julian S. Brod to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30246639) filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaims Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Max J Sprecher added to party Melissa Jefferson(pty:pla), Attorney Max J Sprecher added to party Melissa Jefferson(pty:cd)) (Sprecher, Max)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs' First Amended Counterclaim and Third Through Fifth Amended Counterclaims Seeking Royalties and Other Relief Related to Such Declaration #60 presently scheduled for hearing on December 4, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Errata re Defendants' Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
November 19, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jeffersonto Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #73 Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant's Responses to Defendant and Counterclaimants' Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims (Arato, Cynthia)
November 18, 2020 Filing 73 Objections re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims #60 filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
November 13, 2020 Filing 72 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims #60 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Arato, Cynthia)
October 27, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Firm Name.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE #69 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiff's deadline to file her reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss is continued to November 13, 2020; and The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #60 is continued to Friday, December 4, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (iv)
October 23, 2020 Filing 69 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaims Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arato, Cynthia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 68 Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims #60 and Third through Fifth Amended Counterclaims filed by Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
October 16, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendants Heavy Duty Music Publishing, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #65 by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. [See document for details.] (es)
October 13, 2020 Filing 65 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaims Defendant Melissa Jefferson.(Arato, Cynthia)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Stipulation #63 is APPROVED. Defendants and Counterclaimants' deadline to oppose the Motion to Dismiss #60 is continued to 10/16/2020. Plaintiff's deadline to file her reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss is continued to 11/6/2020. The hearing on on the Motion to Dismiss is continued to 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
September 29, 2020 Filing 63 STIPULATION to Reschedule Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant Justin Raisen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secretov, Allen)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME OF COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS ERIC FREDERIC, JESSE ST. JOHN GELLER, AND STEVEN CHEUNG TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon the parties' Joint Motion #59 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counterdefendants Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller, and Steven Cheung shall respond to the First Amended Counterclaims of Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Heavy Duty, LLC, and Justin "Yves" Rothman no later than 14 days after this Court enters an order denying the pending motion to dismiss, or granting the pending motion to dismiss without leave to amend. If the Court enters an order granting the pending motion to dismiss with leave to amend, Counterdefendants shall respond to the Second Amended Counterclaims no later than 21 days after their filing. In the future, the parties shall avoid submitting requests for continuance or extension of time less than five court days prior to the expiration of the scheduled date. See Initial Standing Order at 11 (Doc. No. #7 ); Judge Gee's Procedures and Schedules at paragraph 7, United States District Court, Central District of California website. (gk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaims Defendant Melissa Jefferson. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix Appendix A to Memorandum of Points and Authorities) (Arato, Cynthia)
September 21, 2020 Filing 59 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Counterclaims filed by Counter Defendants Steven Cheung, Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arato, Cynthia)
September 3, 2020 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS against Counterdefendants Melissa Jefferson professionally known as Lizzo, Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller, Steven Cheung, and Roes 1-10; amending Counterclaims #27 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin "Yves" Rothman, and Heavy Duty LLC. (First Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaims filed as one document, see document number 58)(gk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER and Counterclaims to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant/ Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Lizzo's Motion to Dismiss the Truth Hurts Claims #41 is GRANTED, with leave to amend. Lizzo's Motion to Strike is GRANTED, with leave to amend, as to Counterclaimants' third, fifth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tentth, thirteenth, fifteenth, and seventeenth affirmative defenses, and DENIED in all other respects. Counterclaimants shall file their First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, or notify the Court and Lizzo of their intent not to do so, by 9/4/2020. Lizzo shall file her response within 21 days after Counterclaimants file their First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME OF COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS ERIC FREDERIC, JESSE ST. JOHN GELLER, AND STEVEN CHEUNG TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendants and Counterclaimants Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Heavy Duty, LLC, and Justin "Yves" Rothman and Counterdefendants Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller, and Steven Cheung jointly move for an order extending the time for Mr. Frederic, Mr. Geller, and Mr. Cheung, to respond to the Counterclaims until after the Court has ruled on Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Melissa Jefferson, p/k/a Lizzo's Motion to Dismiss, which was submitted for decision without oral argument on 5/15/2020 #55 . Good cause exists for the requested extensions. Accordingly, these Counterdefendants shall respond to the Counterclaims no later than 14 days after this Court enters an order denying the pending motion to dismiss, or granting the pending motion to dismiss without leave to amend. If the Court enters an order granting the pending motion to dismiss with leave to amend, Counterdefendants shall respond to the Amended Counterclaims no later than 21 days after their filing. (gk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 55 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaims filed by Counterdefendant Steven Cheung, Eric Frederic, Jesse St. John Geller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Cynthia S Arato added to party Steven Cheung(pty:cd), Attorney Cynthia S Arato added to party Eric Frederic(pty:cd), Attorney Cynthia S Arato added to party Jesse St. John Geller(pty:cd)) (Arato, Cynthia)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Second Counterclaim for a Declaration of Co-ownership in "Truth Hurts," and Third Through Fifth Counterclaims for Royalties and Other Relief Related to Such Declaration and Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Devoid of Factual Support #41 presently scheduled for hearing on May 12, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 7, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSES TO OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses #41 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Arato, Cynthia)
May 5, 2020 Filing 52 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related), #48 DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Defendants Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on May 15, 2020. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Declaration (Motion related), #49 (Arato, Cynthia)
May 1, 2020 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Cynthia S. Arato In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses #41 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Comparison of Lyrics, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Recordings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Musicologist Report)(Arato, Cynthia)
May 1, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses #41 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A - Comparison of Lyrics)(Arato, Cynthia)
May 1, 2020 Filing 47 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman.. (Secretov, Allen)
April 16, 2020 Filing 46 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses #41 filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
April 10, 2020 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. upon Jesse St. John Geller waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Edwin F. McPherson, Attorney for Jesse St. John Geller. (Secretov, Allen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. upon Eric Frederic waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Howard E. King, Attorney for Eric Frederic. (Secretov, Allen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Justin Raisen, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. upon Steven Cheung waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matt Cutler, Attorney for Steven Cheung. (Secretov, Allen)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues the scheduling conference #32 from April 17, 2020 to May 15, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Melissa Jefferson. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Arato, Cynthia)
March 20, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, Counter Defendant Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arato, Cynthia)
March 4, 2020 Filing 39 21-Day Summons Issued re Counterclaims #27 as to Counterdefendant Eric Frederic. (gk)
March 4, 2020 Filing 38 21-Day Summons Issued re Counterclaims #27 as to Counterdefendant Steven Cheung. (gk)
March 4, 2020 Filing 37 21-Day Summons Issued re Counterclaims #27 as to Counterdefendant Jesse St. John Geller. (gk)
March 3, 2020 Filing 36 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #33 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
March 3, 2020 Filing 35 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #33 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
March 3, 2020 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #33 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Yves Rothman, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
March 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Counterclaim #27 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The Summons lacks the party caption for the Counterclaim. Below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," please indicate "ON THE COUNTERCLAIM." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
March 3, 2020 Filing 32 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
February 28, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Counter Claimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman, Defendants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman (Iser, Lawrence)
February 28, 2020 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #27 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
February 28, 2020 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #27 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
February 28, 2020 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #27 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Heavy Duty LLC, Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman. (Iser, Lawrence)
February 28, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Melissa Jefferson filed by Defendants Jeremiah Raisen, Justin Raisen, Justin Rothman, Heavy Duty LLC.(Attorney Lawrence Yale Iser added to party Heavy Duty LLC(pty:dft))(Iser, Lawrence)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Lawrence Y. Iser for Defendant Justin Raisen in place of Attorneys Aaron P. Rudin and Candice S. Nam #23 . (gk)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Lawrence Y. Iser for Defendant Jeremiah Raisen in place of Attorneys Aaron P. Rudin and Candice S. Nam #22 . (gk)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Lawrence Y. Iser for Defendant Justin "Yves" Rothman in place of Attorneys Aaron P. Rudin and Candice S. Nam #21 . (gk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Lawrence Y. Iser in place of attorney Aaron P. Rudin filed by Defendant Justin Raisen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rudin, Aaron)
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Lawrence Y. Iser in place of attorney Aaron P. Rudin filed by Defendant Jeremiah Raisen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rudin, Aaron)
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Lawrence Y. Iser in place of attorney Aaron P. Rudin , REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Lawrence Y. Iser in place of attorney Aaron P. Rudin filed by Defendant Justin Rothman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rudin, Aaron)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Lawrence Y. Iser for Defendant Heavy Duty LLC erroneously sued as Heavy Duty Music Publishing in place of Attorneys Aaron P. Rudin and Candice S. Nam #19 . (gk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Lawrence Y. Iser in place of attorney Aaron P. Rudin filed by Defendant Heavy Duty Music Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rudin, Aaron)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Heavy Duty Music Publishing answer now due 2/28/2020; Jeremiah Raisen answer now due 2/28/2020; Justin Raisen answer now due 2/28/2020; Justin Rothman answer now due 2/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Heavy Duty Music Publishing; Jeremiah Raisen; Justin Raisen; Justin Rothman.(Attorney Aaron P Rudin added to party Heavy Duty Music Publishing(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron P Rudin added to party Jeremiah Raisen(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron P Rudin added to party Justin Raisen(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron P Rudin added to party Justin Rothman(pty:dft))(Rudin, Aaron)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, upon Defendant Justin Rothman served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Rothman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, upon Defendant Heavy Duty Music Publishing served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jasmine Chin - Studio Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, upon Defendant Jeremiah Raisen served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeremiah Raisen in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, upon Defendant Justin Raisen served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Raisen in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arato, Cynthia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Justin Rothman. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Heavy Duty Music Publishing. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeremiah Raisen. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeremiah Raisen. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Justin Raisen. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons)(Arato, Cynthia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson, (Arato, Cynthia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson. (Arato, Cynthia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24655930 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Jefferson. (Attorney Cynthia S Arato added to party Melissa Jefferson(pty:pla))(Arato, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissa Jefferson v. Justin Raisen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jefferson
Represented By: Cynthia S Arato
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Represented By: Julian S. Brod
Represented By: Max J. Sprecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Raisen
Represented By: Allen Secretov
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Shawn Holley
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Duty Music Publishing
Represented By: Allen Secretov
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Shawn Holley
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rothman
Represented By: Allen Secretov
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Shawn Holley
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Raisen
Represented By: Allen Secretov
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Shawn Holley
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Duty LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Justin Yves Rothman
Represented By: Allen Secretov
Represented By: Gregory Philip Korn
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Shawn Holley
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eric Frederic
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jesse St. John Geller
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Steven Cheung
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?