Hector Zotea v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hector Zotea
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Does 1 to 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09148
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel S DeSantis counsel for Plaintiff Hector Zotea. Adding Daniel DeSantis as counsel of record for Hector Zotea for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Hector Zotea. (Attorney Daniel S DeSantis added to party Hector Zotea(pty:pla))(DeSantis, Daniel)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09148 MWF(AFMx). (rn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Filed in State Court on 9/4/2019 Submitted with attachment 12 to notice of removal #1 .(car)
October 24, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25, inclusive, Walmart Inc., filed by Plaintiff Hector Zotea. Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Felton, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Felton, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Felton, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV25675 Receipt No: 0973-24662124 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Notice of Lodgment of State Court File, #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #6 Summons, #7 Notice of Case Assignment, #8 Order on Court Fee Waiver, #9 PI General Order, #10 Certificate of Mailing, #11 Demand for Jury Trial - conformed, #12 Answer - conformed, #13 Stipulation and Order - conformed, #14 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Justin Ryan Felton added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Felton, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector Zotea v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Justin Ryan Felton
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Zotea
Represented By: Natalie Ashouri
Represented By: Daniel S DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?