Cheryl O'Neill v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl O'Neill
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv09154
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #9 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of C.R. Bard, Inc., et al. to substitute William Goines as attorney of record instead of Richard B North, Jr is GRANTED. (iv)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD, INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Goines, William)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Yeung counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding Anna Yeung as counsel of record for DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD and PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD, INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.. (Attorney Anna Yeung added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Anna Yeung added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Yeung, Anna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Jeffrey Goines counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding William J. Goines as counsel of record for C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD, INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.. (Goines, William)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Williams J. Goines in place of attorney Richard B. North Jr. filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD, INC. and PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney William Jeffrey Goines added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney William Jeffrey Goines added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft)) (Goines, William)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard B North, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David May. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
October 22, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-03128-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16028617 filed by Cheryl O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheryl O'Neill v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl O'Neill
Represented By: David May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: William Jeffrey Goines
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: William Jeffrey Goines
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?