Catherine Finn v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Finn
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv09155
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Bastian
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
3 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Bastian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Within 30 days from the date of this Order, the parties are directed to show cause why the Court should not impose the following schedule for case specific discovery, specific dispositive motions, and case specific Daubert motions (if any): Within 14 days after entry of the Courts Scheduling Order, Rule 26(a) disclosures shall be exchanged by the Parties. Within 30 days after entry of the Courts Scheduling Order, Plaintiff will produce the completed Plaintiffs Fact Sheet and related information utilized in the In re: C.R. Bard, Inc. IVC Filter MDL. See order for further details. (shb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam W Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Finn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/1/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24712316) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an APPLICATION, not a MOTION. (lt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam W Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Finn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/1/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24712316) filed by Plaintiff Catherine Finn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Cowper, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#19-074) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Stanley A. Bastian for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09155 SAB (PJWx). (esa) Modified on 11/19/2019 (esa).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #11 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The request of C.R. Bard, Inc. to substitute William J. Goines as attorney of record instead of Richard B. North,Jr. is GRANTED. (iv)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Krause) #16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/22/2019. (iv)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01945 MWF(PJWx). Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09155 MWF(PJWx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam W. Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Finn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24712316) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 **STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam W. Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Finn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24712316) filed by Plaintiff Catherine Finn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Cowper, Christopher) Modified on 11/14/2019 Per Order #20 (iv).
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Moze Cowper on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Finn (Attorney Christopher Moze Cowper added to party Catherine Finn(pty:pla))(Cowper, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying C.R. BARD INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC.. (Goines, William)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Yeung counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding ANNA YEUNG as counsel of record for C.R. BARD, INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD, INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.. (Attorney Anna Yeung added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Anna Yeung added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Yeung, Anna)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Jeffrey Goines counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding WILLIAM J. GOINES as counsel of record for C.R. BARD INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS C.R. BARD INC. and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INC.. (Goines, William)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY WILLIAM J. GOINES in place of attorney RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney William Jeffrey Goines added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney William Jeffrey Goines added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft)) (Goines, William)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard B North, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert L Kinsman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam W Krause. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona
October 22, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04118-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16982973 filed by Catherine Finn. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catherine Finn v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: William Jeffrey Goines
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: William Jeffrey Goines
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Finn
Represented By: Adam W Krause
Represented By: Robert L Kinsman
Represented By: Christopher Moze Cowper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?