Bertha Barragan et al v. Select Portfolio et al
Plaintiff: Rolando De Armas, Javier Benavides, Bertha Barragan and Rosana Benavides
Defendant: Select Portfolio, The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr, Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 2:2019cv09157
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been informed there is no updated address or phone number for plaintiffs on the docket, and having been advised no updated information has been provided to defense counsel, hereby dismisses the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned addressed to Rolando De Armas re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 (lc)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09157 PSG(ASx). (rn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Select Portfolio, The Bank of New York Mellon, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 10-28-19. (Im, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 3 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, Select Portfolio, The Bank of New York Mellon., filed by plaintiffs Rolando De Armas, Bertha Barragan, Rosana Benavides, Javier Benavides. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 PAGE 009) (ghap)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Removal filed by Defendants Select Portfolio, The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Im, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Select Portfolio identifying Credit Suisse AG as Corporate Parent. (Im, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr identifying The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Im, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Select Portfolio, The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr, identifying The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Credit Suisse AG. (Im, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV33499 Receipt No: 0973-24662876 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr, Select Portfolio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Robert June-Yong Im added to party Select Portfolio(pty:dft), Attorney Robert June-Yong Im added to party The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr(pty:dft))(Im, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertha Barragan et al v. Select Portfolio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando De Armas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosana Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio
Represented By: Robert June-Yong Im
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, F/K/A the Bank of New York as Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR6 Mortgage Pass-Thr
Represented By: Robert June-Yong Im
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Robert June-Yong Im
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Robert June-Yong Im
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?