Eliseo Flores v. Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Eliseo Flores
Defendant: Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C., Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C. and Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09162
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Substitution of Named Defendant. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #14 set for Monday, December 23, 2019 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Brian Birnie, Esq. re Order to Show Cause #21 re: Diversity filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Email Confirmation of Letter)(Birnie, Brian)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #12 set for Monday, December 16, 2019 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores, (Barsoum, Rony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order to Show Cause re Diversity by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition Defendant Garfield Beach CVS L.L.C.'s Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scupine in support of Defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Eliseo Flores' Motion to Remand to State Court with Exhibits)(Scupine, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 by Defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C. filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (Barsoum, Rony)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Mann in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Five Causes of Action #12 filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint)(Barsoum, Rony)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Five Causes of Action #12 filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (Barsoum, Rony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (Barsoum, Rony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Mann in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - E-mail 11_18_19, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - E-mail 11_19_19, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - E-mail 11_19_19)(Barsoum, Rony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Barsoum, Rony)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion to Dismiss Five Causes of Action #12 . The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing date to 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Local Rule 6-1, requires that the motion be filed 28 days before the date set for hearing and this Courts standing order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Five Causes of Action filed by defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)) (Scupine, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Upon Superior Court served on October 29, 2019. (Scupine, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #2 , Exhibit (non-trial) #6 , Exhibit (non-trial) #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Documents No. 2, 3 and 6. The correct events are Declaration and Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 30, Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eliseo Flores. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/27/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.. Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Notice of Financial Interest as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Scupine, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Scupine, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Scupine, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.. Declaration of Jason Scupine in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Scupine, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.. Declaration of Melanie Luker in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Scupine, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV34558 Receipt No: 0973-24663907 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.. (Attorney Jason J Scupine added to party Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Scupine, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliseo Flores v. Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliseo Flores
Represented By: Matthew L Mann
Represented By: Rony M Barsoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Beach, CVS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jason J Scupine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Brian William Birnie
Represented By: Jason J Scupine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?