PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. J.G. Wentworth Home Lending, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Defendant: J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 2:2019cv09182
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC, identifying PennyMac Financial Services, Inc.. (Gross, Nicholas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC filed by Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC.(Gross, Nicholas)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney John D Sadler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC, designating Nicholas Martin Gross as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John D. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24907161) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John D. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24907161) filed by Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Gross, Nicholas)
December 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Alan M. Hurst APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, designating Justin D. Balser as local counsel. (et)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for plaintiff shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 10 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC answer now due 12/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC.(Attorney Nicholas Martin Gross added to party J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC(pty:dft))(Gross, Nicholas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alan M. Hurst to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24778570) filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balser, Justin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, upon Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Client Representative/CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Balser, Justin)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC. (et)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, identifying PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Balser, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Balser, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Balser, Justin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24667828 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attorney Justin D Balser added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Balser, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. J.G. Wentworth Home Lending, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Represented By: Alan M Hurst
Represented By: Preston Konow Ascherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.G. Wenworth Home Lending, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Gross
Represented By: John D Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?