Jesus Lopez v. Michael Weinig, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez
Defendant: Michael Weinig, Inc., Michael Weinig, AG and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09186
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19STCV30612. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
October 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc. Filed in State Court on 10/24/2019 Submitted with Exhibit C attachment 3 to notice of removal #7 .(car)
October 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 25, inclusive, Michael Weinig, AG, Michael Weinig, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Jesus Lopez. Filed in State Court on 8/29/19 Submitted with Exhibit A attachment 1 to notice of removal #7 (car) Modified on 10/28/2019 (car).
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV30612 Receipt No: 0973-24670360 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sozio, Michaela)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is a Notice of Removal erroneously e-filed under the wrong event of NOTICE (other). Please re-file the document under the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Initial Pleadings and Service Complaints and Other Initiating Documents and select Notice of Removal. (car)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc., of Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court served on 10/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sozio, Michaela)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James D. Meadows to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24668544) filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sozio, Michaela)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc., identifying none. (Attorney Michaela Battista Sozio added to party Michael Weinig, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sozio, Michaela)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc.. (Sozio, Michaela)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1441(b) (Diversity) filed by Defendant Michael Weinig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sozio, Michaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Lopez v. Michael Weinig, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weinig, Inc.
Represented By: Michaela Battista Sozio
Represented By: James D Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weinig, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez
Represented By: Karina Godoy
Represented By: Joseph M Lovretovich
Represented By: Jared Wesley Beilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?