Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC v. Moschino S.P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC
Defendant: Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Moschino S.p.A. and Jeremy Scott
Counter Defendant: Elder Ordonez
Case Number: 2:2019cv09220
Filed: October 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #27 . Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC.(Perkowski, Peter)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu re: Notice of Settlement #25 . (Dismissal papers due by 3/27/2020. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/30/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
January 30, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Elder Ordonez, Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Moschino S.P.A., upon Counterdefendant Elder Ordonez served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elder Ordonez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Williams, David)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS]- ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 2/20/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than 2/10/2020. See Local Rule 26-1. (et)
January 15, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), COUNTERCLAIM, #17 as to counter-defendant Elder Ordonez. (mrgo)
January 14, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #17 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Moschino S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott, (Tehranian, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jeremy Scott.(Attorney John Tehranian added to party Jeremy Scott(pty:dft))(Tehranian, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Moschino S.P.A., identifying Moschino, S.p.A.; Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC; Jeremy Scott; Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar; Elder Ordonez; Aeffe, S.p.A.. (Williams, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC, Elder Ordonez filed by Defendant Moschino S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney David John Williams added to party Moschino S.P.A.(pty:dft))(Williams, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (et)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09220 GW(FFMx). (rn)
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. upon Jeremy Scott waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John Tehranian, counsel. (Perkowski, Peter)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. upon Moschino S.P.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Waiver of Service signed by C.J. Veverka, counsel. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (lh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeremy Scott. (lh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Moschino S.P.A. (lh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
October 26, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC, identifying Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC, Moschino S.p.A., Jeremy Scott, and Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)
October 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24676779 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC. (Attorney Peter E Perkowski added to party Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC(pty:pla))(Perkowski, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC v. Moschino S.P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moschino S.p.A.
Represented By: David John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Scott
Represented By: John Tehranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Splash News and Picture Agency, LLC
Represented By: Peter E Perkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Elder Ordonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?