Kathleen Wininger v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wininger
Defendant: Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09341
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 89 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Benedict, Mollie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 88 MINUTES(iN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court grants the parties' stipulation to extend the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is now scheduled for Monday, January 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The Court further orders the parties to file a Joint Status Report by no later than December 16, 2019. The parties shall meet and confer and cooperate in the preparation of this document and binders of prior orders and rulings, and submit the binders to the Courts Chambers Courtesy Box by Monday, December 16, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS AND DECREES that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for December 16, 2019, is rescheduled to January 6, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 86 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from December 16, 2019 to January 6, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Wininger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, Tracie)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #81 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Julie A Callsen terminated; granting #81 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Julie A Callsen terminated (yl)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #80 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David B Thomas; Philip J Combs and Susan M Robinson terminated; granting #80 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David B Thomas; Philip J Combs and Susan M Robinson terminated (yl)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #79 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christy D Jones; Kari L Sutherland; Mollie Fleming Benedict and William M Gage terminated; granting #79 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christy D Jones; Kari L Sutherland; Mollie Fleming Benedict and William M Gage terminated (yl)
November 19, 2019 Filing 81 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Julie A. Callsen of Tucker Ellis LLP as counsel of record , REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedict, Mollie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 80 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY David B. Thomas, Phillip J. Combs and Susan M. Robinson of Thomas Combs and Spann PLLC as counsel of record , REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedict, Mollie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 79 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY William M. Gage, Christy D. Jones and Kari L. Sutherland as counsel of record , REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedict, Mollie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Wininger, re Order #77 , COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS #1 via regular mail served on November 18, 2019. (Palmer, Tracie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 75 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lee B. Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kathleen Wininger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24791165) filed by KATHLEEN WININGER Kathleen Wininger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Peter)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #72 Non-Resident Attorney TRACIE L. PALMER APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Kathleen Wininger, designating Peter Kaufman as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RES IDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #75 Non-Resident Attorney Lee B. Balefsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kathleen Wininger, designating Peter Kaufman as local counsel. (yl)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for December 16, 2019, at 8:30 a.m., and orders the Clerk to issue the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference. Lead trial counsel are ordered to be present. The parties shall file their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Joint Report by no later than December 2, 2019. (mrgo)
November 12, 2019 Filing 72 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney TRACIE L. PALMER to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kathleen Wininger (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24762316) filed by KATHLEEN WININGER Kathleen Wininger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Peter L Kaufman added to party Kathleen Wininger(pty:pla)) (Kaufman, Peter)
November 6, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #60 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #67 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #64 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #59 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #69 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #70 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #61 , Notice of Receipt of Case Transferred in - optional html form, #55 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #63 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #58 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #57 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #56 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #68 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #62 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #65 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #66 e-mailed to Michelle Tiger bounced due to michelle.tiger@klinespecter.com couldn't be delivered. michelle.tiger wasn't found at klinespecter.com. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Nicholas V. Janizeh as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Janizeh, Nicholas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua J Wes counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Joshua J. Wes as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Wes, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Mollie F. Benedict as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Benedict, Mollie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William M. Gage. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kari L. Sutherland. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan M. Robinson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Combs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Julie A. Callsen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David B. Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christy D. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tracie L. Palmer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Tiger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lee B. Balefsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:13-cv-00284, from USDC Southern District of West Virginia. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-09341 PA (JEMx). (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 54 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from West Virginia Southern
October 26, 2019 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4864) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Challenging The Opinions of Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4901) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4902) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D. for Wave 6 by All Pla, #4 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4908) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4909) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Suzanne Parisian, #6 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4910) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4916) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D. for Wave 6 by Al, #8 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4918) NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PRIOR DAUBERT RESPONSES REGARDING CHRISTINA PRAMUDJI FOR WAVE 6, #9 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4923) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Elaine Duncan for Wave 6, #10 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4928) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Steven MacLean, M.D., for Wave 6 by Ethicon W, #11 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4940) Notice of Adoption of Wave 3 Daubert Response Regarding Douglas Grier, #12 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4973) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Timothy Ulatowski for Wave 6 by Ethico, #13 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4984) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Elaine Duncan, M.D. for Wave 6, #14 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4990) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Douglas Grier, #15 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5000) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Steven MacLean, Ph.D. for Wave 6 by All Plaintif, #16 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5003) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Christina Pramudji, M.D. for Wave 6 by All Plain, #17 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5007) Notice of Adoption of Reply in Support of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Donald Ostergard, #18 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5010) NOTICE of Adoption of Reply in Support of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude General-Causation T, #19 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5020) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. for Wave 6 by All Plaint, #20 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5024) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #21 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5025) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #22 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5029) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Regarding Scott A. Guelcher, #23 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (5032) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Regarding Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D. for Wave 6 by Eth, #24 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (74809) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Elaine Duncan, M.D. for Wave 6, #25 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (74816) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Douglas Grier, #26 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (74828) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Steven MacLean, Ph.D. for Wave 6 by All Plaint, #27 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (74831) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Christina Pramudji, M.D. for Wave 6 by All Pla)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2019 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3592) Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #2 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3594) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #3 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3619) Part 1; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3619) Part 2; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3621) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Vladirmir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3788) MEMORANDUM in opposition to MOTION to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D, #7 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3790) Part 1; RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3790) Part 2; RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3790) Part 3; RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3845) REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #11 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3865) REPLY IN SUPPORT of Motion to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D., #12 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4573) Part 1; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #13 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4573) Part 2; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #14 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4573) Part 3; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #15 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4573) Part 4; MOTION to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #16 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4574) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Scott Guelcher, Ph.D., #17 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4675) Part 1; MEMORANDUM in opposition to (4573) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #18 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4675) Part 2; MEMORANDUM in opposition to (4573) MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D, #19 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4692) MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, #20 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4817) Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Scott Guelcher, #21 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4820) NOTICE of Adoption of Ethicon_s Motion to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Ia, #22 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4855) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Challenging the General-Causation Opinions of Dion, #23 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4860) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, MD for Wave 6 by All Plainti, #24 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4862) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, #25 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (4863) Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2019 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2284) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, #2 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2287) Part 1; Defendants Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2287) Part 2; Defendants Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2297) Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition of Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2530) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christina Pramudji, #6 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2759) Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D., #7 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2760) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D., #8 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2814) Motion to Exclude the General Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D., #9 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2816) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D., #10 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2820) Motion to Exclude or Limit General Causation Testimony of Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D., #11 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2821) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dionysios Veronikis, #12 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2825) Motion to Exclude or limit the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean PHD PE, #13 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2826) Memorandum in support to Exclude or Limit the opinions and testimony of Steven Maclean PHD PE, #14 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2890) Plaintiffs_ Resp. in Opp. to Defs._ Mot. to Exclude Veronikis, #15 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2910) Notice of Response and Adoption of prior response regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #16 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2921) Memorandum by Ethicon in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Douglas Grier, M.D._33188981_1, #17 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2942) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D., #18 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2949) MEMORANDUM by ALL Plaintiffs in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D., #19 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2950) RESPONSE by ALL Plaintiffs in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D._, #20 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (2982) REPLY MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Douglas Grier, M.D, #21 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3011) Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D._, #22 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3017) REPLY by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D., #23 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3019) REPLY by Ethicon in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #24 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3033) Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dionysios Veronikis, #25 Exhibit ECF#50 Continued, (3053) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Tes)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 26, 2019 Filing 50 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) FIRST AMENDED MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND, #2 Exhibit (239) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT. (ras)_13906847_1, #3 Exhibit (241) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT. (ras)_13906977_1, #4 Exhibit (262) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. (ras)_14066686_1, #5 Exhibit (263) AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. (ras)_14066608_1, #6 Exhibit (2022) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Douglas Grier, M.D., #7 Exhibit (2024) MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Testimony of Douglas Grier, M.D, #8 Exhibit (2033) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #9 Exhibit (2035) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D, #10 Exhibit (2036) MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 2033 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #11 Exhibit (2037) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christina Pramudji, #12 Exhibit (2060) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude the Opinions of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski. (Attachment, #13 Exhibit (2065) MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 2060 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude the Opi, #14 Exhibit (2134) RESPONSE by Ethicon Women_s Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnso..., #15 Exhibit (2153) RESPONSE by Defendants_ in opposition to 2035 MOTION by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 1 Cases, #16 Exhibit (2155) Part 1; Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Elaine Duncan, M.D., #17 Exhibit (2155) Part 2; Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Elaine Duncan, M.D., #18 Exhibit (2179) MEMO in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Douglas Grier, #19 Exhibit (2205) Part 1; MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #20 Exhibit (2205) Part 2; MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #21 Exhibit (2205) Part 3; MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.., #22 Exhibit (2206) MEMORANDUM in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Maclean, #23 Exhibit (2223) Memorandum in Reply to Defendants_ Opposition to Plaintiffs_ Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ms. Elaine Duncan_31197790_1, #24 Exhibit (2232) Plaintiffs_ Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #25 Exhibit (2236) REPLY in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/25/2019 to remove terminated party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kathleen Wininger (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Donald R. Ostergard, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Donald R. Ostergard, M.D.) filed at ECF No. 2683 in MDL 2327 on 8/30/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/1/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Peggy Pence, Ph. D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Peggy Pence, Ph. D.) filed at ECF No. 2664 in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/1/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D.) entered at ECF No. 2712 in MDL 2327 on 9/1/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/31/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Scott Guelcher, Ph.D.) directing that the 2698 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Scott Guelcher, Ph.D.) entered at ECF No. 2698 in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) entered at ECF No. 2710 in MDL 2327 on 9/1/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 38 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kathleen Wininger, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Palmer, Tracie) (Modified on 10/30/2017 to remove link and to add party filers) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Excerpts Wininger Dep Transcript redacted, #2 Ex. B - Excerpts Dr Alisod Dep Transcript, #3 Ex. C - Excerpts Plaintiff Fact Sheet)(Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Marie Lerminiau on 10/26/17 at TBD (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mark Wininger on 10/26/17 at TBD (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiff's friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Admission. (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF PARTIES REGARDING THE DEPOSITIONS OF CASE-SPECIFIC EXPERT WITNESSES, AND FACT WITNESSES INCLUDING TREATING PHYSICIANS, FAMILY MEMBERS, AND FRIENDS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kathleen Wininger (Callsen, Julie) (Modified on 8/6/2017 to add party filer) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #14 Notice of Video Deposition of Shlomo Raz, M.D. by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Callsen, Julie) (Modified on 7/31/2017 to add link to # 14 notice to take or amend deposition) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 28 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION by Kathleen Wininger of Shlomo Raz, M.D. on 8/09/2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Palmer, Tracie) (Modified on 7/31/2017 to convert event to Notice To Take Or Amend Deposition) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 26 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION by Kathleen Wininger of Red Alinsod, M.D. on July 31, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Palmer, Tracie) (Modified on 7/28/2017 to convert event to notice of deposition)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathleen Wininger for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Tracie L. Palmer on behalf of Kathleen Wininger. (Palmer, Tracie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Heba Farag, M.D. on July 17, 2017 at 5:00 P.M. (PST) (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Red Alinsod, M.D. on July 31, 2017 at 1:30 PM (PDT) (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER # 261 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) directing Ethicon, LLC be dismissed without prejudice from each case remaining in Wave 6, identified on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/23/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 6 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Kathleen Wininger. (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 19 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Kathleen Wininger. (Clarke, Christine) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kathleen Wininger on July 13, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Red Alinsod on 8/9/17 at 9 a.m. (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Julie A. Callsen on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Callsen, Julie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 251 (Docket Control Order - Wave 6 Cases) The parties recently submitted a joint list of 400 of the oldest cases in the Ethicon MDL not already in a wave that name only Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and/or Johnson & Johnson or allege claims against only the Ethicon defendants' products. These cases, attached hereto as Exhibit A, will be known as the "Ethicon Wave 6 cases," and it is ORDERED as follows: Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 6 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 5/25/2017, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 6/26/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 8/11/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 7/27/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 8/28/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 9/11/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/25/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2017, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/06/2017, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/23/2017, Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/06/2017, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/13/2017. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/21/2017, any response is due 9/05/2017 and any reply is due 9/12/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/30/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/27/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 6 cases listed on Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Shlomo Raz on 8/9/17 at 9am (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Heba Farag on 8/9/17 at 9am (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 26, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 14, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 3, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 13, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, LLC. Ethicon, LLC served on 1/22/2013, answer due 2/12/2013. Summons served on scott lascala. (Tiger, Michelle) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 5, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 30 (Order Cancelling January 10, 2013, In Chambers Conference and Status Conference) entered on 01/08/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 9, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (gjb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 8, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2162763. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gjb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathleen Wininger v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Julie A Callsen
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Julie A Callsen
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Julie A Callsen
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wininger
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Tracie L Palmer
Represented By: Michelle Tiger
Represented By: Peter L Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?