Kris De Nava v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kris De Nava
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Teamsters Union Local 166
Case Number: 2:2019cv09347
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 38 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (iv)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 19-56411. The stipulated request for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. 5) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. (yl)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) #35 by Judge Percy Anderson. It is therefore ordered that Defendants shall have until January 17, 2020 to file its responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (lom)
December 17, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Teamsters Union Local 166 answer now due 1/17/2020, filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zakson, Laurence)
December 12, 2019 Filing 33 BRIEF filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. In Opposition to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Arriola in Support of Defendant Costco's Opposition to Remand, #2 Proof of Service)(McConnell, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. In Opposition to Remand and in Support of Removal of State Court Action (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Remand of Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Local 166)(Sheh, William)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND #26 by Judge Percy Anderson. (yl)
December 6, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson: Cause called; appearances made. Court and counsel confer. Defendants' brief as to the issue of remand is due by noon on December 12, 2019. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by December 17, 2019. The matter will then be deemed under submission. The Court will let the parties know if oral argument will be necessary. The Status Conference set for December 9, 2019 is vacated. No appearances are necessary. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56411 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #29 as to defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (mrgo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Remand Case to State Court, #14 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24874751.) (Sheh, William)
December 2, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kris De Navato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #22 To Order To Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew P. Malczynski in Support of Plaintiff's Response To Order To Show Cause)(Malczynski, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Costco Wholesale Corporation answer now due 12/20/2019; Teamsters Union Local 166 answer now due 12/20/2019, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(McConnell, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 EX PARTE APPLICATION to AMEND Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #22 Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Counsel filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheh, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew P Malczynski counsel for Plaintiff Kris De Nava. Adding Matthew P. Malczynski as counsel of record for Kris De Nava for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kris De Nava. (Attorney Matthew P Malczynski added to party Kris De Nava(pty:pla))(Malczynski, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, re Order, #19 by Judge Percy Anderson served on November 19, 2019. (McConnell, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William Y Sheh on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166 (Attorney William Y Sheh added to party Teamsters Union Local 166(pty:dft))(Sheh, William)
November 18, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Percy Anderson: Because Local 166's Notice was filed on the same day the Court issued its Order remanding this case, the Court did not see Local 166's Notice prior to issuing its Order, and did not address Local 166's additional argument in its Order. Thus, the Court vacates the Order remanding this case to the Superior Court of California in Los Angeles. The clerk is ordered to forward a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit. (See minutes for further details) Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (yl)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court further orders Plaintiffs counsel to show cause, in writing, by December 6, 2019, why the Court should not sanction Plaintiffs counsel for failure to appear at the telephonic conference which took place on November 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. See document for further details. (gk)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson Telephone Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, #2 Addendum (1) to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, #3 Addendum (2) to Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *[VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER DE #23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19PSCV00423. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo) Modified on 11/21/2019 (yl).
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of of Laurence S. Zakson of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court re Joinder (non-motion) #7 filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF FILING OF CONSENT TO AND JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION; AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF DEFENDANT LOCAL 166 filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on October 31, 2019. (McConnell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166, identifying Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen, Industrial and Allied Workers of America, Local 166. (Attorney Laurence S Zakson added to party Teamsters Union Local 166(pty:dft))(Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of of Dan Hernandez re Joinder (non-motion) #7 in Support of Notice of Consent to and Joinder in Removal filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166. (Zakson, Laurence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendant Teamsters Union Local 166 joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Zakson, Laurence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
October 30, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT. The Plaintiff, having designated a defendant in the complaint by the incorrect name of COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, filed by Plaintiff Kris De Nava. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO Declaration of M. McConnell AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1-50, inclusive, Teamsters Union Local 166 amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Kris De Nava. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 8 #1 . (et)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kris De Nava. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO.2 #1 . (et)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jacqueline Chooljian. New Case Number 2:19-cv-09347-PA (JCx). (et)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (McConnell, Matthew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, a Washington Corporation, identifying Kris De Nava, Costco Wholesale Corporation, and Teamsters Union Local 166. (McConnell, Matthew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19PSCV00423 Receipt No: 0973-24700072 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, a Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. McConnell in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Original Complaint, #3 State Court Original Summons, #4 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Notice of Case Assignment, #6 State Court Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 State Court Amended Summons, #8 State Court First Amended Complaint) (Attorney Matthew Scott McConnell added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation, a Washington Corporation(pty:dft))(McConnell, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kris De Nava v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Tara Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew Scott McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Union Local 166
Represented By: Laurence S Zakson
Represented By: William Y Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris De Nava
Represented By: Glenn E Stern
Represented By: Matthew P Malczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?