In re Philip James Layfield
Appellant: Philip James Layfield and Philip J Layfield
Appellee: Richard M. Pachulski
Case Number: 2:2019cv09375
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 PHILIP J. LAYFIELD'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #7 filed by Appellant Philip J Layfield (yl)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (yl)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLANT STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO BE PRESENTED ON APPEAL filed by Appellant Philip J Layfield re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . (et)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE RE NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT. (et)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court: A designation of record A statement of issues on appeal A notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than December 3, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Phillip Layfield (yl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Philip J Layfield. (yl)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (car)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 10/30/2019. (car)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-15829-NB, Adversary number: 2:19-ap-01071-NB, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Plaintiff Philip James Layfield. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Philip James Layfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Philip James Layfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Philip J Layfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard M. Pachulski
Represented By: James K T Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?